Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00699-CV    
14-17-00699-CV
08/23/2017
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Bryon Dean Jordan 
Texas Children's Hospital 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/01/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/08/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/14/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
09/14/2018Motion for rehearing due 
08/30/2018Judgment Issued 
08/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/07/2018Letter issued by the court 
05/10/2018Submitted 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/09/2018Appellees brief due 
03/01/2018Case ready to be set 
03/01/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/07/2018Appellees brief due 
02/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/08/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/08/2018Appellants brief due 
12/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/11/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
12/08/2017Appellants brief due 
10/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/25/2017Appellants brief due 
09/25/2017Clerks record filed 
09/22/2017Clerks record due 
09/22/2017Record due 
09/18/2017Appearance of counsel 
09/15/2017Response due 
09/07/2017Mediation docketing statement returned 
09/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/07/2017Mediation docketing statement returned 
09/07/2017Docketing statement due 
09/07/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
09/05/2017Past due court fee notice 
09/05/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
09/05/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
09/02/2017Court fee due 
08/23/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/23/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/23/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/23/2017Case began in court of appeals 
06/23/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
05/25/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/2018StatusPetition for review due in the Supreme Court
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jordan, Bryon DeanAppellantPaul A. Higdon
Daniel Farris Crowder
Texas Children's HospitalAppelleeFrank N. Luccia
Mary M. Wagner  
James C. Dalrymple
Trial Court Information
295th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 295th District Court 
2016-08118 
Court Reporter, 295th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site