Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00682-CV    
14-17-00682-CV
08/18/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Damon Kendrick Dove 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/19/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
11/30/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
10/31/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/2018Submitted 
04/25/2018Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
01/19/2018Reply brief filed 
01/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
12/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedGRANTED
11/30/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/30/2017Case ready to be set 
11/30/2017Appellees brief due 
11/17/2017Response due 
11/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
11/07/2017Order entered 
11/01/2017Appellants brief due 
10/31/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/17/2017Order entered 
10/02/2017Appellants brief due 
09/29/2017Affidavit filed 
09/21/2017Appellants brief due 
09/15/2017Response due 
09/14/2017Affidavit filed 
09/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/07/2017Motion filed 
09/05/2017Past due court fee notice 
09/05/2017Response due 
09/02/2017Docketing statement due 
09/02/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
08/28/2017Clerks record due 
08/28/2017Court fee due 
08/28/2017Record due 
08/24/2017Dismissal letter 
08/22/2017Clerks record filed 
08/21/2017Notification received that no record was taken 
08/21/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/18/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/18/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/18/2017Case began in court of appeals 
08/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
06/27/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dove, Damon KendrickAppellantDamon Kendrick Dove
The State of TexasAppelleeAmber McKeon-Mueller
Trial Court Information
268th District Court 
Fort Bend 
 
16-DCV-232297 
Mindy Hall 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site