Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00681-CV    
14-17-00681-CV
08/17/2017
Real Property
Gilchrist Community Association 
County of Galveston, Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/12/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
05/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/09/2018Amicus curiae brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/13/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/10/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedGRANTED
06/19/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
06/19/2018Letter filed 
06/12/2018Reply brief filed 
06/12/2018Reply brief due 
05/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
05/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
05/09/2018Case ready to be set 
05/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/09/2018Appellees brief due 
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/09/2018Amicus curiae brief received 
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/09/2018Appellees brief due 
03/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/09/2018Appellants brief due 
02/27/2018Motion disposedGRANTED
02/15/2018Motion to dismiss disposedTAKEN WITH THE CASE
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/07/2018Motion filed 
02/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/07/2018Appellants brief due 
01/24/2018Supplemental clerks record filed 
01/23/2018Order entered 
01/05/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
12/27/2017Appellants brief due 
11/28/2017Clerks record due 
11/27/2017Clerks record filed 
11/15/2017Response due 
11/14/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGRANTED
11/14/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
11/14/2017Document returned 
11/14/2017Supplemental clerks record received 
10/31/2017Letter filed 
10/31/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
10/31/2017Clerks record due 
10/10/2017Reporters record filed 
10/05/2017Clerks record due 
09/21/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGRANTED
09/21/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
09/20/2017Notice of late record 
09/19/2017Reporters record due 
09/19/2017Record due 
09/15/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/15/2017Fee paid 
09/15/2017Response due 
09/05/2017Past due court fee notice 
09/02/2017Docketing statement due 
09/02/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
08/28/2017Court fee due 
08/18/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/18/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/17/2017Case began in court of appeals 
07/21/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gilchrist Community AssociationAppellantWinston E. Cochran, Jr.
Calvin Jackson
County of Galveston, TexasAppelleeKenneth E. McKay
Gulf Coast Rod, Reel and Gun Club, Inc.UnknownCharles W. Irvine
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2 
Galveston 
Honorable Judge, County Court At Law # 2 
CV-0076026 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site