Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00671-CV    
14-17-00671-CV
08/15/2017
Contract
Howard F. Lederer 
James C. Lederer, Susan Lederer Russell, Kathleen T. Lederer, Marjorie E. Lederer 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/12/2018Reply brief filedAppellee
02/20/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
01/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/08/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
09/14/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
09/14/2018Motion for rehearing due 
08/30/2018Judgment Issued 
08/30/2018Opinion issuedAFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART
04/25/2018Submitted 
03/12/2018Reply brief filed 
03/12/2018Reply brief due 
02/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
02/20/2018Reply brief filed 
02/19/2018Reply brief due 
01/19/2018Case ready to be set 
01/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/19/2018Appellees brief due 
12/08/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/08/2017Appellants brief due 
11/02/2017Letter filed 
10/31/2017Motion disposed 
10/31/2017Order entered 
10/25/2017Appellants brief due 
10/11/2017Motion filed 
10/10/2017Response due 
10/09/2017Clerks record due 
09/27/2017Notice received 
09/25/2017Clerks record filed 
09/25/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
09/22/2017Notice of late record 
09/21/2017Reporters record due 
09/21/2017Clerks record due 
09/21/2017Record due 
09/05/2017Letter filed 
09/01/2017Response due 
08/30/2017Docketing statement due 
08/30/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
08/25/2017Letter filed 
08/25/2017Court fee due 
08/23/2017Reporters record filed 
08/21/2017Notice received 
08/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/21/2017Notice filed 
08/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/21/2017Letter filed 
08/21/2017Fee paid 
08/21/2017Mediation docketing statement returned 
08/17/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
08/17/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/15/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/15/2017Letter issued by the court 
08/15/2017Case began in court of appeals 
08/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
06/20/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
05/24/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/2018MotionExtension of time to file motion for rehearing
10/15/2018StatusPetition for review due in the Supreme Court
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lederer, Howard F.AppellantShawn McKee
Casey Jon Lambright
Sean Farrell
James C. Lederer, Susan Lederer Russell, Kathleen T. Lederer, Marjorie E. LedererAppelleeLaurellen Ratliff
Adam Herron
Frank N. Ikard Jr.
Trial Court Information
270th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 270th District Court 
2015-29219 
Annette Peltier 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site