Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00620-CR    
14-17-00620-CR
07/31/2017
Aggravated Assault
Irvin Autrey 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/17/2018Waiver of remaining time to file briefState
01/08/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/2018Case stored 
06/20/2018Mandate issued 
06/20/2018Mandate due to be issued 
05/29/2018Petition for discretionary review was not filed 
05/29/2018Petition for discretionary review due 
05/11/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
05/11/2018Motion for rehearing due 
05/07/2018Notice received 
04/26/2018Judgment Issued 
04/26/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/26/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedGRANTED
04/25/2018Submitted 
03/29/2018Set for submission on briefs 
03/29/2018Case ready to be set 
03/09/2018State brief due 
02/07/2018Anders response due 
01/17/2018Waiver of remaining time to file brief 
01/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/08/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
01/08/2018Anders brief filed 
01/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/08/2018Case reinstated 
01/08/2018Notice received 
12/13/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/04/2017Hearing record filed 
12/04/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/08/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/06/2017Supplemental clerks record due 
11/06/2017Hearing record due 
10/05/2017Order issuedABATED
09/25/2017Response due 
09/13/2017Notice of late brief 
09/01/2017Appellants brief due 
08/15/2017Clerks record due 
08/02/2017Clerks record filed 
07/31/2017Notice of late record 
07/31/2017Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
07/31/2017Case began in court of appeals 
07/12/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/03/2014Clerks record due 
09/04/2014Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/2018Case StoredCase stored
06/22/2043RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Autrey, Irvin Criminal - AppellantIrvin Autrey
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDan McCrory
Eric Kugler
Kim K. Ogg
Trial Court Information
185th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 185th District Court 
1418132 
 
5 Yrs. Deffered Adjuitication 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site