Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00580-CR    
14-17-00580-CR
07/21/2017
Tampering With or Fabricating Physical Evidence
Charles Robert Ransier 
The State of Texas 
No 
3rd Court of Appeals 
07/21/2017 
03-17-00444-CR 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/22/2018Additional authorities filedState
03/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
12/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Additional authorities filed 
04/26/2018Submitted 
03/26/2018State brief due 
03/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/21/2018Response due 
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/06/2018Notice of late brief 
03/05/2018State brief due 
02/22/2018Case ready to be set 
02/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/12/2018State brief due 
01/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/12/2018State brief due 
12/18/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
12/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/13/2017Appellants brief due 
11/13/2017Appellants brief due 
11/08/2017Appellants brief due 
11/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/20/2017Reporters record due 
10/12/2017Reporters record filed 
10/09/2017Exhibits filed 
10/09/2017Reporters record filed 
09/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
09/19/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/05/2017Clerks record filed 
08/28/2017Record due 
07/21/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/21/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
07/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ransier, CharlesCriminal - AppellantAmanda Erwin
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasStacey M. Soule
Sammy M. McCrary
Joshua Presley
Trial Court Information
207th District Court 
Comal 
Honorable Jack H. Robison 
CR2016-303 
Mary Scopas 
Life 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site