Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00547-CV    
14-17-00547-CV
07/17/2017
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Jeffrey Wells 
Texas Department of Public Safety 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/19/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
02/23/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
02/02/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
12/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/2018Motion to file amended brief disposedGRANTED
04/24/2018Submitted 
04/20/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
04/19/2018Amended brief filed 
04/19/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
02/27/2018Letter issued by the court 
02/26/2018Letter filed 
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
02/23/2018Reply brief filed 
02/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
02/12/2018Letter issued by the court 
02/02/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/02/2018Case ready to be set 
02/02/2018Appellees brief due 
01/03/2018Appellees brief due 
12/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
12/01/2017Appellants brief due 
11/16/2017Order entered 
11/10/2017Appellants brief due 
10/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/02/2017Fee paid 
10/02/2017Response due 
09/25/2017Appellants brief due 
09/13/2017Reporters record due 
09/07/2017Motion disposed 
09/07/2017Order entered 
09/07/2017Reporters record due 
09/05/2017Letter filed 
08/24/2017Reporters record filed 
08/14/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/14/2017Response due 
08/09/2017Response due 
08/08/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/08/2017Letter filed 
08/07/2017Motion filed 
08/04/2017Document returned 
08/04/2017Supplemental clerks record received 
08/03/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/03/2017Past due court fee notice 
08/01/2017Motion to dismiss disposedDENIED
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedGRANTED
08/01/2017Docketing statement due 
08/01/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
07/27/2017Court fee due 
07/25/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
07/25/2017Clerks record filed 
07/25/2017Reporters record due 
07/25/2017Record due 
07/24/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
07/24/2017Letter filed 
07/21/2017Mediation docketing statement returned 
07/21/2017Motion to dismiss filed 
07/17/2017Letter issued by the court 
07/17/2017Letter issued by the court 
07/17/2017Case began in court of appeals 
07/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
07/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/26/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
03/27/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wells, Jeffrey AppellantJeffrey Wells
Texas Department of Public Safety AppelleeRebecca Burkhalter
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, County Civil Court At Law No. 3 
1084054 
Court Reporter, County Civil Court No. 3 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site