Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00541-CV    
14-17-00541-CV
07/14/2017
Contract
Amelia V. Kelly 
Matthew D. Wiggins, Jr. and D. L. Hammaker 
No 
1st Court of Appeals 
07/14/2017 
01-17-00460-CV 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/01/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/02/2018Letter issued by the court 
05/24/2018Appellees brief due 
05/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/09/2018Submitted 
03/30/2018Case ready to be set 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/14/2018Response due 
02/27/2018Notice of late brief 
02/23/2018Appellees brief due 
02/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/07/2018Response due 
01/24/2018Response due 
01/23/2018Notice of late brief 
01/19/2018Appellees brief due 
01/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2018Notice of late brief 
01/05/2018Appellees brief due 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/20/2017Response due 
12/05/2017Notice of late brief 
12/01/2017Appellees brief due 
11/02/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/01/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/01/2017Appellants brief due 
10/17/2017Order entered 
10/09/2017Appellants brief due 
09/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/25/2017Appellants brief due 
08/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
08/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/24/2017Appellants brief due 
08/23/2017Clerks record due 
08/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedGRANTED
08/11/2017Response due 
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
08/01/2017Order entered 
08/01/2017Response due 
07/25/2017Clerks record filed 
07/24/2017Letter filed 
07/24/2017Letter filed 
07/24/2017Response due 
07/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/14/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
07/14/2017Clerks record due 
07/14/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/14/2017Record due 
07/13/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
07/13/2017Order enteredCase transferred to another COA
07/11/2017Letter issued by the court 
07/11/2017Court fee due 
07/11/2017Docketing statement due 
07/07/2017Motion to transfer filed 
06/28/2017Motion disposedGRANTED
06/26/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
06/22/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
06/22/2017Fee paid 
06/22/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
06/22/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
06/21/2017Notice of appeal received 
06/21/2017Case began in court of appeals 
06/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/15/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/09/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kelly, Amelia V.AppellantGeorge Frederick May
Larry A. Vick
Matthew D. Wiggins, Jr. and D. L. HammakerAppelleeGeorge William Vie, III
Timothy A. Beeton
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court 
Galveston 
Honorable Judge 122nd District Court 
13-CV-1392 
Connie Chan 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site