Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00481-CR    
14-17-00481-CR
06/19/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Mark Anthony Gasaway 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/24/2018Submitted 
02/23/2018State brief due 
02/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/22/2018Case ready to be set 
02/22/2018Set for submission on briefs 
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/13/2018State brief due 
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/13/2017State brief due 
11/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/13/2017Appellants brief due 
10/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/13/2017Appellants brief due 
10/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/04/2017Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk 
09/25/2017Exhibits filed 
09/15/2017Exhibits filed 
09/15/2017Reporters record due 
09/13/2017Reporters record filed 
08/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
08/16/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/16/2017Reporters record due 
07/18/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
07/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/17/2017Reporters record due 
07/17/2017Record due 
07/12/2017Clerks record filed 
06/19/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
06/19/2017Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
06/19/2017Case began in court of appeals 
05/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/17/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Rebecca Klaren
Jack Roady
Gasaway, Mark AnthonyCriminal - AppellantJames Ducote
Trial Court Information
56th District Court 
Galveston 
Honorable Judge, 56th District Court 
16-CR-1519 
Tara L. Wilson 
42 Yrs. TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site