Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00411-CR    
14-17-00411-CR
05/26/2017
Murder
Robert DeWayne Bolden 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/2018Notice of late brief 
05/16/2018State brief due 
04/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/25/2018State brief due 
04/12/2018Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk 
04/11/2018Response due 
03/30/2018Case ready to be set 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/27/2018Notice of late brief 
03/26/2018State brief due 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/23/2018State brief due 
02/02/2018Appellants brief due 
01/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/20/2017Response due 
11/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/08/2017Notice of late brief 
11/02/2017Appellants brief due 
10/31/2017Clerks record due 
10/03/2017Clerks record filed 
09/28/2017Order entered 
09/25/2017Clerks record due 
09/08/2017Notice of late record 
09/07/2017Clerks record due 
09/07/2017Record due 
07/10/2017Record due 
06/16/2017Exhibits filed 
06/13/2017Exhibits filed 
06/13/2017Reporters record filed 
06/13/2017Reporters record filed 
06/13/2017Letter filed 
06/09/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
05/30/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/26/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
05/26/2017Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
05/26/2017Case began in court of appeals 
05/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/10/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/2018SubmissionBriefs
06/01/2018StatusLate brief notice response due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bolden, Robert DeWayneAppellantCrespin Michael Linton
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKim K. Ogg
Eric Kugler
Patricia McLean
Trial Court Information
185th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 185th District Court 
1487229 
Carrie Scardaville Logan 
99yrs TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site