Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00393-CR    
14-17-00393-CR
05/19/2017
Aggravated Kidnapping
Donte Jerome Alexander 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/25/2018Submitted 
03/29/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/26/2018Case ready to be set 
03/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/26/2018State brief due 
02/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/26/2018State brief due 
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/03/2018State brief due 
12/13/2017Appellants brief due 
12/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/13/2017Appellants brief due 
09/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/13/2017Appellants brief due 
08/16/2017Reporters record due 
08/14/2017Reporters record filed 
07/25/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
07/24/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/17/2017Reporters record due 
07/17/2017Record due 
07/10/2017Clerks record filed 
05/19/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
05/19/2017Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
05/19/2017Case began in court of appeals 
05/17/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/17/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/25/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasEric Kugler
Kim K. Ogg
Kathryn Davis
Alexander, Donte JeromeCriminal - AppellantGerald E. Bourque
Trial Court Information
339th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 339th District Court 
1545993 
Pamela Knobloch 
20 Yrs. TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site