Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00372-CV    
14-17-00372-CV
05/11/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Richard D. Davis, LLP., a Texas General Partnership, Richard D. Davis, LLP, a Nevada Limited Liability Partnership and Patricia Suarez 
Sky Lakes Flyers Foundation and Carbett J. Duhon, III 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/28/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
05/15/2018Submitted 
05/15/2018Reply brief due 
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
04/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
04/05/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/28/2018Case ready to be set 
03/28/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/28/2018Appellees brief due 
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/26/2018Appellees brief due 
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/26/2018Appellees brief due 
01/12/2018Response due 
12/28/2017Notice of late brief 
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/27/2017Appellees brief due 
11/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/17/2017Appellants brief due 
10/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/16/2017Appellants brief due 
10/09/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/15/2017Appellants brief due 
09/11/2017Clerks record due 
08/25/2017Response due 
08/25/2017Clerks record due 
08/16/2017Clerks record filed 
08/11/2017Letter filed 
08/10/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
08/10/2017Notice of late record 
08/09/2017Clerks record due 
07/26/2017Docketing statement filed 
07/10/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGRANTED
07/10/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
07/06/2017Motion disposedNO ACTION TAKEN
07/03/2017Reporters record due 
06/30/2017Reporters record filed 
06/26/2017Appearance of counsel 
06/22/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
06/22/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/21/2017Response due 
06/14/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
06/09/2017Reporters record filed 
06/08/2017Letter filed 
06/06/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
06/06/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
06/06/2017Reporters record due 
06/06/2017Record due 
05/27/2017Docketing statement due 
05/27/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
05/22/2017Court fee due 
05/15/2017Fee paid 
05/12/2017Letter issued by the court 
05/12/2017Letter issued by the court 
05/11/2017Case began in court of appeals 
05/08/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/07/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard D. Davis, LLP., a Texas General Partnership, Richard D. Davis, LLP, a Nevada Limited Liability Partnership and Patricia SuarezAppellantJoe Alfred Izen, Jr.
Sky Lakes Flyers Foundation and Carbett J. Duhon, IIIAppelleeRobert T. Owen  
Kevin Graham Cain
Levon Hovnatanian
Michael T. Fuerst
Carbett J. Duhon, III
Trial Court Information
506th Judicial District Court 
Waller 
Honorable Judge, 506th District Court 
07-08-18999 
Robyn S. Wiley 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site