Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00257-CV    
14-17-00257-CV
04/05/2017
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Richard D. Davis, L.L.P., a Texas General Partnership, Richard D. Davis, L.L.P, a Nevada Limited Liability Partnership and Patricia K. Suarez 
Andy Knott, Bill Green, Dempsey Gearen, Jim Phillips, Phil Birkelbach, Danny Langhorne, Hans van der Voort, Gene Morton, Stanley Hoffpauir and Paul Kates 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/10/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
02/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/20/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2018Submitted 
05/10/2018Reply brief filed 
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
05/09/2018Reply brief due 
05/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
05/07/2018Reply brief due 
05/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
04/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
04/30/2018Reply brief due 
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
04/09/2018Reply brief due 
04/05/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
03/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
02/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/16/2018Case ready to be set 
02/16/2018Appellees brief due 
01/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/19/2018Appellees brief due 
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/20/2017Appellees brief due 
11/20/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/17/2017Appellants brief due 
10/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/16/2017Appellants brief due 
10/09/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
09/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/15/2017Appellants brief due 
08/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
08/16/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/16/2017Appellants brief due 
07/18/2017Motion to consolidate disposedDENIED
07/17/2017Appellants brief due 
07/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
07/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/29/2017Clerks record due 
06/27/2017Response filed 
06/16/2017Clerks record filed 
06/13/2017Letter filed 
06/13/2017Motion to consolidate filed 
06/09/2017Reporters record filed 
06/07/2017Reporters record due 
05/30/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGRANTED
05/30/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
05/19/2017Response due 
05/17/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/08/2017Order entered 
05/05/2017Letter filed 
05/04/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
05/04/2017Reporters record due 
05/04/2017Record due 
05/01/2017Response due 
04/24/2017Fee paid 
04/21/2017Docketing statement due 
04/21/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
04/20/2017Past due court fee notice 
04/16/2017Court fee due 
04/06/2017Letter issued by the court 
04/06/2017Letter issued by the court 
04/05/2017Case began in court of appeals 
04/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
02/03/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
01/04/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard D. Davis, L.L.P., a Texas General Partnership, Richard D. Davis, L.L.P, a Nevada Limited Liability Partnership and Patricia K. SuarezAppellantJoe Alfred Izen, Jr.
Andy Knott, Bill Green, Dempsey Gearen, Jim Phillips, Phil Birkelbach, Danny Langhorne, Hans van der Voort, Gene Morton, Stanley Hoffpauir and Paul KatesAppelleeRobert T. Owen  
Levon Hovnatanian
Michael T. Fuerst
Trial Court Information
506th Judicial District Court 
Waller 
Honorable Judge, 506th District Court 
08-12-19600-A 
Vicki L. Brown 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site