Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00145-CR    
14-17-00145-CR
02/24/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Quenton Dewayne Graves 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/28/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
01/11/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
09/12/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
09/12/2018Motion for rehearing due 
08/28/2018Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/28/2018Judgment Issued 
07/27/2018Exhibits due 
07/26/2018Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk 
07/24/2018Exhibits filed 
07/17/2018Order entered 
05/16/2018Submitted 
04/13/2018State brief due 
03/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/28/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/28/2018Case ready to be set 
02/28/2018Response due 
02/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/13/2018Notice of late brief 
02/12/2018State brief due 
01/12/2018Appellants brief due 
01/11/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/05/2018Appellants brief due 
01/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/06/2017Appellants brief due 
11/06/2017Appellants brief due 
11/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/05/2017Appellants brief due 
09/05/2017Reporters record filed 
09/01/2017Reporters record due 
08/11/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
08/10/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/10/2017Reporters record due 
08/09/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
08/08/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/10/2017Reporters record due 
06/08/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
06/07/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/22/2017Reporters record due 
05/22/2017Record due 
05/17/2017Clerks record filed 
03/21/2017Record due 
03/15/2017Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
03/10/2017Amended notice of appeal filed 
03/10/2017Letter filed 
02/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/27/2017Court reporters information sheet sent 
02/27/2017Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
02/24/2017Case began in court of appeals 
02/20/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
02/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
01/20/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAdam Thomas Muery
Julie L. Renken
Graves, Quenton DewayneCriminal - AppellantJoshua Scott Clover
Trial Court Information
21st District Court 
Washington 
 
17568 
Jan Lynn 
20 Yrs. TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site