Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-17-00113-CV    
14-17-00113-CV
02/13/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Sane Locke 
Briarwood Village 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
08/14/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
05/16/2017Brief struck 
05/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed 
11/14/2018Motion for rehearing due 
10/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/30/2018Judgment Issued 
03/29/2018Submitted 
01/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
11/13/2017Case ready to be set 
11/13/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/13/2017Appellees brief due 
10/11/2017Appellees brief due 
10/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/22/2017Response due 
09/14/2017Appellees brief due 
09/11/2017Reporters record filed 
09/07/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
09/06/2017Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
08/14/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/14/2017Appellants brief due 
06/15/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
06/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/12/2017Appellants brief due 
06/08/2017Appellees brief due 
05/16/2017Brief struck 
05/16/2017Order entered 
05/12/2017Case stayed for mediation 
05/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/08/2017Appellants brief due 
04/06/2017Objection to mediation disposedGRANTED
04/06/2017Case reinstated 
03/21/2017Mediation objection filed 
03/14/2017Order issuedABATED
03/13/2017Reporters record due 
03/13/2017Record due 
03/08/2017Letter filed 
02/28/2017Docketing statement due 
02/28/2017Mediation docketing statement due 
02/23/2017Court fee due 
02/21/2017Letter filed 
02/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
02/21/2017Fee paid 
02/21/2017Clerks record filed 
02/13/2017Letter filed 
02/13/2017Letter filed 
02/13/2017Letter issued by the court 
02/13/2017Letter issued by the court 
02/13/2017Case began in court of appeals 
02/08/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
01/10/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/14/2018StatusPetition for review due in the Supreme Court
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Briarwood VillageAppelleeBreton A. Rycroft
Locke, Sane AppellantSane Locke
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, County Civil Court At Law No. 2 
1086625 
Kevin Bruzewski 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site