Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-15-01078-CR    
14-15-01078-CR
12/22/2015
DWI
Jose Oliva 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/28/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
11/21/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/16/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/2017Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGRANTED
05/01/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
04/28/2017Petition for discretionary review filed 
04/27/2017Petition for discretionary review due 
04/12/2017Motion for rehearing was not filed 
04/12/2017Motion for rehearing due 
03/28/2017Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
01/10/2017Submitted 
12/01/2016Set for submission on briefs 
11/28/2016Reply brief filed 
11/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/21/2016Case ready to be set 
11/21/2016Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/18/2016State brief due 
10/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/19/2016State brief due 
09/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/19/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/19/2016State brief due 
08/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
08/18/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/18/2016State brief due 
07/01/2016Response filed 
06/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
06/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/16/2016Notice of late brief 
06/15/2016State brief due 
05/20/2016Appellants brief due 
05/16/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/20/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/20/2016Appellants brief due 
03/23/2016Record Sent 
03/21/2016Reporters record filed 
03/20/2016Reporters record due 
03/04/2016Order entered 
03/04/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedDENIED
03/03/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/26/2016Reporters record due 
02/24/2016Response due 
02/10/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
02/09/2016Notice filed 
02/09/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/09/2016No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
02/08/2016Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
02/04/2016Supplemental clerks record due 
02/04/2016Hearing record due 
01/27/2016Reporters record due 
01/21/2016Case reinstated 
01/21/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
01/11/2016Hearing record filed 
01/05/2016Order issuedABATED
12/28/2015Reporters record due 
12/28/2015Record due 
12/23/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART
12/23/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
12/22/2015Clerks record filed 
12/22/2015Court reporters information sheet sent 
12/22/2015Trial court clerks certification of record requested 
12/22/2015Case began in court of appeals 
10/29/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
10/29/2015Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/28/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasPatricia McLean
Eric Kugler
Kim K. Ogg
Oliva, Jose Criminal - AppellantTheodore Lee Wood
Jose Oliva
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 1 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, County Criminal Court At Law # 1 
2025101 
Terri L. Johnstone 
180 Days/2 Days Credit  

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site