Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-15-01061-CV    
14-15-01061-CV
12/18/2015
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Kelley Rieves 
BUC-EE's Ltd 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/13/2016Additional authorities filedAppellant
10/11/2016Additional authorities filedAppellee
06/07/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
05/18/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/11/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/2018Case stored 
01/09/2018Mandate issued 
12/27/2017Petition for review was not filed 
12/27/2017Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
12/21/2017Mandate due to be issued 
11/27/2017Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGRANTED
11/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
10/27/2017Motion for rehearing was not filed 
10/27/2017Motion for rehearing due 
10/12/2017Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered in part and Remanded in part
06/26/2017Letter filed 
10/14/2016Submitted 
10/13/2016Additional authorities filed 
10/11/2016Additional authorities filed 
10/06/2016Letter filed 
10/05/2016Letter filed 
08/26/2016Set for submission on oral argument 
06/07/2016Reply brief filed 
05/19/2016Appellees brief due 
05/18/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/18/2016Case ready to be set 
05/11/2016Appellees brief due 
05/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
05/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/11/2016Appellees brief due 
03/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
03/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/17/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/14/2016Appellants brief due 
03/11/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/12/2016Appellants brief due 
02/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
02/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/21/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
01/15/2016Clerks record due 
01/15/2016Record due 
01/13/2016Clerks record filed 
01/08/2016Response due 
01/04/2016Fee paid 
01/04/2016Mediation docketing statement returned 
01/02/2016Docketing statement due 
01/02/2016Mediation docketing statement due 
12/29/2015Past due court fee notice 
12/28/2015Court fee due 
12/23/2015Letter filed 
12/22/2015Docketing statement filed 
12/21/2015Notification received that no record was taken 
12/21/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
12/18/2015Letter issued by the court 
12/18/2015Letter issued by the court 
12/18/2015Case began in court of appeals 
12/14/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/16/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/2018Case StoredCase stored
01/09/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BUC-EE's LTdAppelleeJeffrey S. Wolff
Seth Isgur
Joy M. Soloway
Rieves, KelleyAppellantBruce Johnson
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court 
Brazoria 
Honorable Judge 23rd District Court 
73332 
Donna Reed 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site