Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-15-00396-CV    
14-15-00396-CV
04/30/2015
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jared Woodfill and F.N. Williams, Sr. 
Annise D. Parker, Mayor; Anna Russell, City Secretary; and City of Houston 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/26/2016Case stored 
02/26/2016Mandate issued 
02/25/2016Memorandum opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/25/2016Motion to dismiss disposedGRANTED
02/25/2016Mandate due to be issued 
02/24/2016Submitted 
02/24/2016Case ready to be set 
02/08/2016Motion to dismiss filed 
02/08/2016Appellants brief due 
01/12/2016Order entered 
12/15/2015Motion to dismiss disposedTAKEN WITH THE CASE
11/30/2015Appellants brief due 
11/24/2015Motion to dismiss filed 
10/29/2015Appellants brief due 
10/26/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/26/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/29/2015Reporters record filed 
09/28/2015Reporters record received not filedREFUSED
09/28/2015Reporters record due 
09/24/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
09/23/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/23/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
09/09/2015Reporters record due 
08/10/2015Order entered 
08/03/2015Response due 
07/31/2015Clerks record filed 
07/24/2015Reporters record due 
07/17/2015No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
07/16/2015Letter filed 
07/10/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
07/09/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
07/02/2015Clerks record due 
06/17/2015Notice of late record 
06/15/2015Clerks record due 
06/15/2015Record due 
06/12/2015Response due 
06/11/2015Letter filed 
05/28/2015No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
05/26/2015Response due 
05/22/2015Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/18/2015Docketing statement filed 
05/18/2015Mediation docketing statement returned 
05/18/2015Docketing statement due 
05/18/2015Mediation docketing statement due 
05/14/2015Fee paid 
05/14/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
05/13/2015Past due court fee notice 
05/13/2015Motion disposedDENIED
05/11/2015Letter issued by the court 
05/11/2015Court fee due 
05/07/2015Reply to response or motion filed 
05/07/2015Reply to response or motion filed 
05/05/2015Response filed 
05/04/2015Letter filed 
05/01/2015Motion filed 
05/01/2015Letter issued by the court 
05/01/2015Letter issued by the court 
04/30/2015Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/30/2015Case began in court of appeals 
04/17/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/26/2016Case StoredCase stored
02/28/2022RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Annise D. Parker, Mayor; Anna Russell, City Secretary; and City of HoustonAppelleeDonna Lynn Edmundson
Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison
Kent Rutter
Alexander Lyle Kaplan
Lynne Liberato
Judith Lee Ramsey
Andrew Paul Price
Edward B. Adams JR.
Jared Woodfill and F.N. Williams Sr.AppellantAndy Taylor
Amanda Eileen Staine Peterson
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 152nd District Court 
2014-44974 
Cynthia Martinez 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site