Case: 14-14-00666-CV    
14-14-00666-CV
08/15/2014
Miscellaneous/other civil
Mark Thuesen 
Amerisure Insurance Company and Swamplot Industries LLC and Laurence David Albert, Beth Anne Brinsdon, Doyle Raizner, L.L.P., Michael Patrick Doyle, and Jeffrey Lewis Raizner 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/11/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
02/25/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
01/28/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/2016Case stored 
04/20/2016Mandate issued 
04/19/2016Mandate due to be issued 
03/25/2016Petition for review was not filed 
03/25/2016Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
02/24/2016Motion for rehearing was not filed 
02/24/2016Motion for rehearing due 
02/09/2016Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS MODIFIED
02/09/2016Case reinstated 
01/14/2016Supplemental clerks record due 
01/12/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
01/04/2016Order issuedABATED
05/12/2015Submitted 
03/26/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
03/19/2015Appellants brief due 
03/11/2015Reply brief filed 
02/25/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/25/2015Case ready to be set 
02/17/2015Letter filed 
02/17/2015Appellees brief due 
01/29/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/28/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/28/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/28/2015Appellants brief due 
12/29/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/29/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/29/2014Appellants brief due 
12/12/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
11/25/2014Appellants brief due 
11/20/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
11/19/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/05/2014Clerks record filed 
10/23/2014Clerks record due 
09/23/2014Order entered 
09/23/2014Motion to compel disposedGRANTED
09/23/2014Motion disposedGRANTED
09/18/2014Letter filed 
09/15/2014Motion filed 
09/11/2014Reporters record filed 
09/11/2014Clerks record due 
09/08/2014Motion to compel filed 
09/08/2014Response due 
09/01/2014Docketing statement due 
08/27/2014Fee paid 
08/27/2014Fee paid 
08/27/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/27/2014Notification received that no record was taken 
08/27/2014Docketing statement filed 
08/27/2014Notice of late record 
08/25/2014Reporters record due 
08/25/2014Court fee due 
08/25/2014Record due 
08/15/2014Letter issued by the court 
08/15/2014Letter issued by the court 
08/15/2014Case began in court of appeals 
08/13/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/28/2014Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/2016Case StoredCase stored
04/20/2022RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Amerisure Insurance Company and Swamplot Industries LLC and Laurence David Albert and Beth Anne BrinsdonAppelleeMatthew Birk Baumgartner
James A. Hemphill
Thuesen, Mark AppellantMark Thuesen
Doyle Raizner, L.L.P., Michael Patrick Doyle, and Jeffrey Lewis Raizner AppelleeZandra Foley
Trial Court Information
151st District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 151st District Court 
2012-49262 
Court Reporter, 151st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site