Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-14-00648-CV    
14-14-00648-CV
08/11/2014
Mandamus
In Re Jared Woodfill, Steven F. Hotze, MD F.N. Williams, Sr. and Max Miller 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/12/2014Appendix filedRelator
08/11/2014Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/16/2014Reporters record filed 
09/01/2014Motion for rehearing was not filed 
09/01/2014Motion for rehearing due 
08/15/2014Memorandum opinion issuedDENIED
08/15/2014Response due 
08/14/2014Submitted 
08/14/2014Case ready to be set 
08/14/2014Response filed 
08/14/2014Record filed 
08/12/2014Appendix filed 
08/12/2014Response due 
08/12/2014Letter issued by the court 
08/12/2014Response requested by the court 
08/12/2014Response requested by the court 
08/11/2014Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/01/2014Case StoredCase stored
11/06/2020RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jared Woodfill, Steven F. Hotze, MD F.N. Williams, Sr. and Max MillerRelatorAndy Taylor
Anise D. Parker, Et AlReal party in interestDavid M. Feldman
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Judge, 152nd District Court 
2014-44974 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site