Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-13-00748-CV    
14-13-00748-CV
08/26/2013
Mandamus
In Re Jonathan Day, Et Al 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/26/2013Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2013Case stored 
09/05/2013Motion disposedDENIED AS MOOT
09/05/2013Opinion issuedDENIED
09/05/2013Motion filed 
09/05/2013Reply to response or motion filed 
09/04/2013Reply to response or motion filed 
09/03/2013Response filed 
09/03/2013Response due 
08/27/2013Response requested by the court 
08/27/2013Letter filed 
08/26/2013Record filed 
08/26/2013Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/05/2013Case StoredCase stored
09/13/2019RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Day, Et Al.,, JonathanRelatorRichard Warren Mithoff
Russell S. Post
Trial Court Information
 
Harris 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site