Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-13-00662-CR    
14-13-00662-CR
07/24/2013
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
James Alan Jenkins 
The State of Texas 
No 
9th Court of Appeals 
07/24/2013 
09-13-00313-CR 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/12/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
02/21/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/22/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2017Case stored 
07/14/2017Mandate issued 
07/11/2017Mandate due to be issued 
09/16/2015Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsDISMISSED
07/06/2015Petition for discretionary review due 
07/03/2015Case forwarded to higher court 
07/02/2015Petition for discretionary review filed 
06/19/2015Motion for rehearing was not filed 
06/19/2015Motion for rehearing due 
06/04/2015Opinion issuedDISSENTING
06/04/2015Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
05/21/2014Submitted 
05/15/2014Letter filed 
03/28/2014Set for submission on oral argument 
03/27/2014Response due 
03/26/2014Letter filed 
03/26/2014Letter filed 
03/20/2014Motion disposedGRANTED
03/13/2014Letter issued by the court 
03/12/2014Motion filed 
03/12/2014Reply brief filed 
02/27/2014Motion disposedGRANTED
02/21/2014Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/21/2014Case ready to be set 
02/21/2014Appellees brief due 
02/19/2014Motion filed 
01/22/2014State brief due 
01/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
01/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/23/2013State brief due 
12/18/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
12/18/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/05/2013Motion disposedGRANTED
12/03/2013Letter filed 
11/26/2013Letter issued by the court 
11/22/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/22/2013Motion to exceed brief length filed 
11/22/2013Appellants brief due 
10/25/2013Appellants brief due 
10/23/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/23/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/30/2013Appearance of counsel 
09/26/2013Appellants brief due 
09/23/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/20/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/27/2013Clerks record filed 
08/27/2013Clerks record due 
08/27/2013Record due 
08/26/2013Reporters record filed 
08/21/2013Letter filed 
08/14/2013Letter filed 
08/01/2013Docketing statement filed 
07/24/2013Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/24/2013Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
07/22/2013Appearance of counsel 
07/12/2013Trial court certification filed 
07/12/2013Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2017Case StoredCase stored
07/14/2042RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jenkins, James AlanCriminal - AppellantGeorge McCall Secrest, Jr.
The State Bar of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJon Rodney Meador  
Trial Court Information
359th District Court 
Montgomery 
Honorable Kathleen Hamilton 
12-03-02579-CR 
Darlene Forville 
3 yrs TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site