Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-13-00435-CV    
14-13-00435-CV
05/20/2013
Miscellaneous/other civil
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2006-NC3 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Tom Croft 
Mary Ellen Wolf and David Wolf, on behalf of Themselves And All Others Similarly Situated 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/12/2014Letter brief filedAppellant
08/11/2014Additional authorities filedAppellee
07/11/2014Additional authorities filedAppellant
06/13/2014Letter brief filedAppellant
06/05/2014Post submission brief filedAppellee
01/08/2014Reply brief filedAppellant
11/21/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/23/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/2014Case stored 
10/31/2014Mandate issued 
10/30/2014Mandate due to be issued 
10/06/2014Petition for review was not filed 
10/06/2014Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
09/05/2014Motion for rehearing was not filed 
09/05/2014Motion for rehearing due 
08/21/2014Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
08/12/2014Letter brief filed 
08/11/2014Additional authorities filed 
07/11/2014Additional authorities filed 
06/13/2014Letter brief filed 
06/05/2014Post submission brief filed 
05/13/2014Motion disposedGRANTED
05/06/2014Motion filed 
02/20/2014Submitted 
02/10/2014Letter filed 
02/06/2014Letter filed 
01/15/2014Set for submission on oral argument 
01/08/2014Reply brief filed 
01/08/2014Reply brief due 
12/23/2013Set for submission on oral argument 
11/26/2013Reply brief due 
11/25/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
11/22/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
11/21/2013Case ready to be set 
11/21/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
11/21/2013Appellees brief due 
10/29/2013Reply brief due 
10/22/2013Motion disposedDENIED
10/21/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
10/15/2013Notice of late brief 
10/11/2013Appellees brief due 
10/08/2013Response filed 
10/04/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/04/2013Motion to abate appeal filed 
10/02/2013Letter filed 
09/11/2013Appellees brief due 
09/04/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
08/28/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
08/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/12/2013Appellees brief due 
08/02/2013Appellants brief due 
07/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
07/25/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/23/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/09/2013Clerks record due 
07/03/2013Clerks record filed 
07/02/2013Motion to appear pro hac vice disposedGRANTED
06/24/2013Notice of late record 
06/19/2013Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
06/19/2013Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
06/19/2013Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
06/17/2013Clerks record due 
06/17/2013Clerks record due 
06/05/2013Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGRANTED
06/05/2013Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
06/05/2013Docketing statement due 
05/31/2013Notice of late record 
05/31/2013Court fee due 
05/28/2013Reporters record filed 
05/28/2013Clerks record due 
05/28/2013Record due 
05/23/2013Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
05/22/2013Docketing statement filed 
05/22/2013Letter filed 
05/21/2013Court reporters information sheet sent 
05/21/2013Letter issued by the court 
05/21/2013Letter issued by the court 
05/20/2013Case began in court of appeals 
05/17/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
05/17/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/01/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/2014Case StoredCase stored
11/06/2020RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2006-NC3 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Tom CroftAppellantThomas V. Panoff
Lucia Nale
Peter C. Smart
Mary Ellen Wolf and David WolfAppelleeBrandy Wingate Voss  
William Craft Hughes  
Trial Court Information
151st District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Mike Engelhart 
2011-36476 
Carolyn Ruiz Coronado 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site