Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-12-01145-CV    
14-12-01145-CV
12/18/2012
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of M.M.M. and S.H.M., Minor Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/09/2013Reply brief filedAppellant
08/09/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/29/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/21/2015Case stored 
07/21/2015Mandate issued 
07/16/2015Notice received 
07/16/2015Mandate due to be issued 
06/05/2015Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtDENIED
02/02/2015Case forwarded to higher court 
07/02/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/02/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGRANTED
07/02/2014Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
07/01/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
06/30/2014Petition for review due in Supreme Court 
05/15/2014Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedDENIED
04/29/2014Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
04/29/2014Motion for rehearing due 
04/28/2014Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedGRANTED
04/25/2014Motion for rehearing en banc filed 
04/25/2014Motion for rehearing due 
04/24/2014Appearance of counsel 
04/10/2014Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/19/2013Motion to substitute attorney disposedGRANTED
11/12/2013Motion to substitute attorney filed 
10/02/2013Submitted 
09/30/2013Set for submission on oral argument 
09/23/2013Letter filed 
09/09/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
09/09/2013Letter filed 
09/09/2013Reply brief filed 
09/09/2013Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/30/2013Set for submission on oral argument 
08/28/2013Appellees brief due 
08/09/2013Case ready to be set 
08/09/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/29/2013Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/29/2013Appellees brief due 
07/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
07/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/28/2013Appellees brief due 
06/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
06/24/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/18/2013Supplemental clerks record filed 
05/31/2013Appellants brief due 
05/29/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/01/2013Appellants brief due 
04/30/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/30/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/01/2013Appellants brief due 
03/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
03/28/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/01/2013Clerks record filed 
02/27/2013Clerks record due 
02/22/2013Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGRANTED
02/21/2013Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/19/2013Clerks record due 
02/04/2013Notice of late record 
01/28/2013Clerks record due 
01/28/2013Record due 
01/24/2013Reporters record filed 
01/03/2013Docketing statement due 
01/03/2013Mediation docketing statement due 
12/31/2012Court fee due 
12/20/2012Docketing statement filed 
12/19/2012Court reporters information sheet sent 
12/19/2012Letter issued by the court 
12/19/2012Letter issued by the court 
12/18/2012Case began in court of appeals 
12/12/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/12/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/28/2012Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/21/2015Case StoredCase stored
07/21/2021RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Close, CindyAppelleeGrady Reiff
Nguyen, PhongUnknownCharles L. Henke Jr.
Kate H. McConnico
Marvin McMurrey, IIIAppellantMichele B. Chimene
Sallee S. Smyth
Trial Court Information
247th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Bonnie Crane Hellums 
2012-45952B 
Court Reporter, 247th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site