Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-11-00714-CV    
14-11-00714-CV
08/19/2011
Mandamus/prohibition
In Re Stephanie Lee 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/22/2011Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2011Memorandum opinion issuedDENIED
09/13/2011Submitted 
09/13/2011Case ready to be set 
09/12/2011Appearance of counsel 
09/09/2011Reply to response or motion filed 
09/08/2011Reply to response or motion filed 
09/07/2011Response due 
09/06/2011Response filed 
08/23/2011Response requested by the court 
08/22/2011Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/13/2011Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasRespondentDeterrean Gamble
Michael D. Becker
John A. Ramirez
John B. Worley
Rande Herrell
Redus, Benjamin JayRespondentClinton Fancher Lawson
Lee, StephanieRelatorScott Rothenberg
Trial Court Information
309th District Court 
Harris 
 
2005-41798 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site