Fourteenth Court of Appeals

Case: 14-11-00693-CR
08/12/2011
Aggravated Robbery
Manley Dewayne Johnson  
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/27/2012Additional authorities filedAppellant
12/20/2012Additional authorities filedAppellant
09/27/2012Post submission brief filedState
06/15/2012Reply brief filedAppellant
06/07/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
04/11/2012Amended brief filedAppellant
04/02/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
04/17/2013Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsStateGRANTED
04/12/2013Mandate due to be issued  
02/28/2013Case forwarded to higher court  
02/27/2013Petition for discretionary review filedState 
02/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsStateGRANTED
02/19/2013Petition for discretionary review was not filed  
02/19/2013Petition for discretionary review due  
01/17/2013Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedStateDENIED
01/17/2013Motion for rehearing disposedStateDENIED
12/27/2012Additional authorities filedAppellant 
12/21/2012Response dueAppellant 
12/20/2012Additional authorities filedAppellant 
12/17/2012Response filedAppellant 
12/11/2012Response requested by the court  
11/15/2012Petition for discretionary review due  
11/14/2012Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedStateGRANTED
11/14/2012Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc disposedStateGRANTED
11/13/2012Motion for en banc reconsideration filedState 
11/13/2012Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing enbanc filedState 
11/13/2012Motion for rehearing filedState 
11/13/2012Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filedState 
10/31/2012Motion for rehearing was not filed  
10/31/2012Motion for rehearing due  
10/16/2012Opinion issued AFFIRMED AS MODIFIED
09/27/2012Post submission brief filedState 
09/25/2012Objection filedAppellant 
09/20/2012Supplemental clerks record filed  
09/13/2012Submitted  
08/31/2012Letter filedAppellant 
08/15/2012Letter filedState 
08/08/2012Motion disposedAppellantGRANTED
08/08/2012Set for submission on oral argument  
07/30/2012Motion to reconsider filedAppellant 
07/25/2012Set for submission on briefs  
06/15/2012Reply brief filedAppellant 
06/08/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedStateGRANTED
06/07/2012Case ready to be set  
06/07/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedState 
06/07/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filedState 
05/30/2012Response dueState 
05/15/2012Notice of late briefState 
05/11/2012State brief due  
05/02/2012State brief due  
04/19/2012Order entered  
04/19/2012Motion to supplement record disposedAppellantDENIED
04/11/2012Amended brief filedAppellant 
04/11/2012Motion to file amended brief disposedAppellantGRANTED
04/11/2012Motion to file amended brief filedAppellant 
04/02/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant 
04/02/2012Appellants brief due  
03/26/2012Motion to supplement record filedAppellant 
03/21/2012Appellants brief due  
03/20/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantGRANTED
03/20/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
03/12/2012Supplemental clerks record due  
03/02/2012Affidavit filed  
03/01/2012Order entered  
03/01/2012Motion to supplement record disposedAppellantGRANTED
02/14/2012Motion to supplement record filedAppellant 
02/13/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedAppellantGRANTED
02/13/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filedAppellant 
02/13/2012Appellants brief due  
01/13/2012Case reinstated  
01/12/2012Supplemental clerks record filedAppellant 
01/06/2012Letter issued by the court  
12/16/2011Supplemental clerks record due  
12/16/2011Hearing record due  
12/14/2011Letter filedDistrict Clerk 
12/13/2011Motion disposedAppellantGRANTED
12/12/2011Hearing record filedAppellant 
12/12/2011Motion filedTrial court judge 
11/30/2011Letter issued by the courtTrial court judge 
11/11/2011Supplemental clerks record due  
11/11/2011Hearing record due  
10/18/2011Order issued ABATED
10/11/2011Letter filedAppellant 
10/06/2011Motion filedAppellant 
09/27/2011Clerks record due  
09/19/2011Clerks record filedAppellant 
08/15/2011Trial court clerks certification of record requested  
08/12/2011Case began in court of appeals  
08/04/2011Notice of appeal filed in trial court  
07/29/2011Sentence imposed in the trial court  
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/28/2013Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Johnson, Manley DewayneCriminal - AppellantJani J. Maselli Wood
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBridget Holloway
Trial Court Information
230th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Belinda Hill 
1283867 
 
7 Years TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site