Supreme Court

Case: 14-0984    
14-0984
11/25/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
MADELON HYSAW, KATHRYN HYSAW WEAFER, MICHAEL AND CINDY BURRIS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP III, LTD., BYRON M. BURRIS AND JUDITH ANN BURRIS DZIUK 
BRETTON GUY DAWKINS, BRADLEY KEN DAWKINS, JERRY HOWARD OXFORD AND SHARON ANN OXFORD 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerPetitioners' Oral Argument Handout. On behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
09/04/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behald of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
08/10/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al.
07/01/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of the Petition for Review filed on behalf of Trinity Mineral Management, Ltd.
04/02/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petititon for Review filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
03/13/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al.
02/17/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of the Petition for Review filed by M. C. Cottingham Miles and Allen D. Cummings.
02/12/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Petitioners Hysaw, et al. filed on behalf and submitted by Jeffrey R. Akins of San Antonio, Texas.
01/05/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioner Madelon Hysaw, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/11/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
01/29/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
01/29/2016Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment.  Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court.
(1/29/2016 11:52:58 AM) 14-0984.jmt.pdf, 140984.pdf
12/08/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Mary A. Keeney; Argued on behalf of respondents by Judith R. Blakeway
12/07/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioners' Oral Argument Handout. On behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
10/29/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form, filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Mary A. Keeney of Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody.
10/12/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form, filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Judith R. Blakeway or Strasburger & Price, LLP.
10/09/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 8, 2015.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
10/09/2015Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
10/09/2015Petition for Review granted  
09/04/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behald of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
08/11/2015Call received Ms. Keaney called to request whether the due date for the Reply Brief would be moved up since the Response Brief was filed early.  Informed her that the Reply Brief due date will remain the same.
08/10/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al.
07/02/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due August 20, 2015; and Reply brief is due September 4, 2015.
07/02/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al.
07/01/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
05/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedFirst Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al. is Granted; Petitioner's Brief due July 1, 2015; Response Brief due July 21, 2015; Reply Brief due August 5, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
05/15/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
05/07/2015Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
05/01/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
05/01/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than June 1, 2015; Reponse brief due June 22, 2015; Reply brief due July 7, 2015.
04/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of the Petition for Review filed on behalf of Trinity Mineral Management, Ltd.
04/02/2015Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petititon for Review filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
03/13/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al.
02/20/2015Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response to petition for review due no later than March 23, 2015.
02/17/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of the Petition for Review filed by M. C. Cottingham Miles and Allen D. Cummings.
02/12/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Petitioners Hysaw, et al. filed on behalf and submitted by Jeffrey R. Akins of San Antonio, Texas.
01/20/2015Case forwarded to Court  
01/14/2015Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Bretton Guy Dawkins, et al.
01/05/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Petitioner Madelon Hysaw, et al.
11/26/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al. has been granted. Petition due January 5, 2015.
11/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Madelon Hysaw, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/11/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Burris, Byron M.PetitionerMr. Thomas H. Crofts Jr.
Mr. Robert C. McKay  
Trinity Mineral Management, Ltd.Amicus CuriaeMr. J. Byron Burton III
Dawkins, Bradley KenRespondentMr. Michael G. Maloney
Ms. Judith R. Blakeway
Mr. James Maverick McNeel
Hysaw, MadelonPetitionerMs. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. Boyce C. Cabaniss
Ms. Laura H. Burney
Mr. John B. McFarland
Michael and Cindy Burris Family Partnership III, Ltd.PetitionerMr. Thomas H. Crofts Jr.
Mr. Robert C. McKay  
Weafer, Kathryn HysawPetitionerMr. John B. McFarland
Ms. Laura H. Burney
Ms. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. Boyce C. Cabaniss
Oxford, Sharon AnnRespondentMr. Michael G. Maloney
Ms. Judith R. Blakeway
Mr. James Maverick McNeel
Cummings, Allen D.Amicus CuriaeMr. Allen D. Cummings
Dawkins, Brenton GuyRespondentMr. Michael G. Maloney
Ms. Judith R. Blakeway
Mr. James Maverick McNeel
Akins, Jeffrey R.Amicus CuriaeMr. Jeffrey R. Akins
Miles, M. C. CottinghamAmicus CuriaeMatthew Miles
Oxford, Jerry HowardRespondentMr. James Maverick McNeel
Ms. Judith R. Blakeway
Mr. Michael G. Maloney
Dziuk, Judith Ann BurrisPetitionerMr. Robert C. McKay  
Mr. Thomas H. Crofts Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
450 SW3d 147, 07-30-14 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Patricia O. Alvarez 
Trial Court Information
81st District Court 
Karnes 
Honorable Donna S. Rayes 
12-05-00107-CVK 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site