Supreme Court

Case: 14-0979    
14-0979
11/24/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
FOREST OIL CORPORATION, NOW KNOWN AS SABINE OIL & GAS CORPORATION 
EL RUCIO LAND AND CATTLE COMPANY, INC., SAN JUANITO LAND PARTNERSHIP, LTD., MCALLEN TRUST PARTNERSHIP, AND JAMES ARGYLE MCALLEN 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/05/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Agricultural Land Trust, et al.
03/30/2017Letter brief PetitionerPetitioner's Reply to Respondent's Letter Brief of March 27, 2017, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
03/27/2017Letter brief RespondentLetter in response to Petitioner's response to Amici Curiae Brief, filed on behalf of McAllen Trust Partnership, et al.
03/06/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Response to Amicus Brief of Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Associaiton, et al., filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Association. Submitted by James D. Bradbury and Courtney Cox Smith of Austin, Texas.
02/07/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
02/07/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Co., Inc., et al.
12/02/2016Petition Reinstated  
10/27/2016Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerReply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Forest Oil Co.
10/18/2016Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Rucio Land & Cattle Co.
06/13/2016Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
05/26/2016Letter brief RespondentLetter Brief filed on behalf of respondents, El Rucio Land and Cattle Co., Inc., et al.
01/11/2016Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corp.
12/04/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of El Rucia Land and Cattle Company, Inc. et al.
09/25/2015Petition Reinstated  
07/01/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
02/17/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corp.
02/04/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Respondents El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc. et al.
01/05/2015Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/09/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/28/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/28/2017Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Justice Green, Justice Johnson, Justice Willett, Justice Guzman, Justice Lehrmann, Justice Boyd, and Justice Devine joined.  (Justice Brown not sitting)

(4/28/2017 12:23:12 PM) 140979.pdf, 14-0979.jmt.pdf
04/07/2017Letter Filed Letter filed informing the Court that Petitioner does not intend to file a response to Amicus Brief of Texas Agricultural Land Trust, et al.
04/05/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Agricultural Land Trust, et al.
03/30/2017Letter brief  Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Letter Brief of March 27, 2017, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
03/27/2017Letter brief  Letter in response to Petitioner's response to Amici Curiae Brief, filed on behalf of McAllen Trust Partnership, et al.
03/06/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Petitioner's Response to Amicus Brief of Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Associaiton, et al., filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers Association. Submitted by James D. Bradbury and Courtney Cox Smith of Austin, Texas.
02/08/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Roger D. Townsend; Argued on behalf of respondents by Warren W. Harris (Justice Brown not sitting)
02/07/2017Letter Received Letter of intent to file amicus brief.  Submitted by James D. Bradbury on behalf of South Texans' Property Rights Association, et al.
02/07/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
02/07/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Co., Inc., et al.
12/28/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Warren W. Harris on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Co., Inc., et al.
12/27/2016Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Roger D. Townsend with Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP of Houston, Texas, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
12/23/2016Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 8, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes (Justice Brown not sitting)
12/02/2016Case set for oral argumentThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.The date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.  (Justice Brown not sitting)
12/02/2016Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
12/02/2016Petition for Review granted  
12/02/2016Petition Reinstated  
12/02/2016Previous Order of the Court withdrawn Denial of petition for review on May 27, 2016 is withdrawn.
12/02/2016Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
10/27/2016Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Reply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Forest Oil Co.
10/18/2016Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Rucio Land & Cattle Co.
09/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Requested Response is due October 19, 2016.
09/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc., et al.
09/02/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested Response to Motion for Rehearing due no later than September 19, 2016.
06/14/2016Case forwarded to Court  
06/13/2016Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
05/27/2016Petition for Review disposedDenied 
05/26/2016Letter brief  Letter Brief filed on behalf of respondents, El Rucio Land and Cattle Co., Inc., et al.
01/11/2016Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corp.
12/07/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corp., has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief on the Merits is due January 11, 2016.
12/07/2015Motion for Extension of Time filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corp.
12/04/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of El Rucia Land and Cattle Company, Inc. et al.
11/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Respondents' brief is due December 4, 2015; and Reply brief is due December 21, 2015.
11/11/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc., et al.
10/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc. et al. has been granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Respondent's Brief is due November 16, 2015. Reply Brief is due December 1, 2015.
10/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits, filed on behalf of El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc. et al.
09/25/2015Petition Reinstated  
09/25/2015Abatement Order Lifted abatement order issued July 24, 2015, lifted
09/25/2015Motion to reinstate case disposedFiling grantedmotion to reinstate this case on the active docket granted
09/21/2015Motion to Reinstate Case filed Unopposed Motion to Reinstate this Case on the Active Docket filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation, now known as Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation.
07/24/2015Order of the Court IssuedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedNote: Effective July 15, 2015, the case is abated pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 8.2 until further order of this Court and is removed from the Court's active docket, subject to reinstatement upon proper motion.   Tex. R. App. P. 8.3.  All motions and other documents pending or filed are abated subject to being reurged in the event the case is reinstated.   Tex. R. App. P. 8.2, 8.3.  It is the parties' responsibility to immediately notify this Court once the automatic bankruptcy stay is lifted.
07/24/2015Petition for Review disposedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas Abated 
07/15/2015Notice of Bankruptcy Notice of Bankrupty filed on behalf of Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation.
07/01/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
05/21/2015Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
05/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion to Extend Time to file Petitiner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Pet's Brief is due July 1, 2015; Resps' Brief is due July 21, 2015; and Pet's Reply Brief is due August 5, 2015.
05/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Forest Oil Corp.
05/04/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
05/01/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than June 1, 2015; Reponse brief due June 22, 2015; Reply brief due July 7, 2015.
02/17/2015Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corp.
02/10/2015Case forwarded to Court  
02/04/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Respondents El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc. et al.
01/05/2015Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corporation.
11/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition is due January 5, 2015.
11/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Forest Oil Corportation.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/09/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
South Texans' Property Rights AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. James D. Bradbury
Forest Oil CorportationPetitionerMr. Johnny W. Carter
Mr. Mitchell C. Chaney
Mr. Roger D. Townsend
Ms. Jennifer Ruth Josephson
Mr. Richard Wolf Hess
Mr. Manmeet Singh Walia
Mr. Geoffrey L. Harrison
Texas Land & Mineral Owners AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. James D. Bradbury
The Landowner Coalition of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. James D. Bradbury
Texas Forestry AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. James D. Bradbury
McAllen Trust PartnershipRespondentMr. Jon Christian Amberson
G. Roland Love
Mr. William M. Parrish
Mr. Jeffrey L. Oldham
Ms. Larissa Janee Hood
Mr. Warren W. Harris
San Juanito Land Partnership, Ltd.RespondentMr. Warren W. Harris
Mr. Jon Christian Amberson
Mr. William M. Parrish
Mr. Jeffrey L. Oldham
G. Roland Love
Ms. Larissa Janee Hood
McAllen, James ArgyleRespondentMr. Jeffrey L. Oldham
Mr. Warren W. Harris
G. Roland Love
Mr. Jon Christian Amberson
Mr. William M. Parrish
Ms. Larissa Janee Hood
El Rucio Land and Cattle Company, Inc. RespondentMr. Jeffrey L. Oldham
Mr. Jon Christian Amberson
G. Roland Love
Mr. Warren W. Harris
Ms. Larissa Janee Hood
Mr. William M. Parrish
Texas and Southwestern Cattle Raisers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. James D. Bradbury
Texas Agricultural Land TrustAmicus CuriaeMr. Joseph B.C. Fitzsimons
Mr. Robert Park
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
446 SW3d 58, 07-24-14 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Laura C. Higley 
Trial Court Information
55th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Jeffrey A. Shadwick 
2005-23091 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site