Supreme Court

Case: 14-0776    
14-0776
09/26/2014
Second Direct Appeal filed
MIKE MORATH, COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY; GLENN HEGAR, TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY; THE TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION; AND THE TEXAS EDUCATION AGENCY 
THE TEXAS TAXPAYER AND STUDENT FAIRNESS COALITION, ET AL.; CALHOUN COUNTY ISD, ET AL.; EDGEWOOD ISD, ET AL.; FORT BEND ISD, ET AL.; TEXAS CHARTER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION, ET AL.; AND JOYCE COLEMAN, ET AL. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/28/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Supplement to Brief of the Texas Public Policy Foundation in Support of Efficiency Intervenors.
02/01/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Kirby Huffman.
02/01/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Kristi Hassett.
01/07/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Michael Q. McShane Ph.D.
10/07/2015Post submission brief filedAppellant in casePost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
09/16/2015Post submission brief filedAppellee in casePost-Submission Letter Brief submitted on behalf of Appellees Fort Bend ISD, et al., Calhoun County ISD, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., and the Texas Taxpayer and Student Fairness Coalition, et al.
09/08/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae brief, filed on behalf of Zaakir Tameez and Amy Fan.
09/01/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae brief, filed on behalf of the Pastors for Texas Children, by David Russell of Templeton, Smithee, Hayes, Heinrich & Russell, LLP.
09/01/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellee in caseOral Argument Exhibit of Joyce Coleman, et al.
08/31/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellee in caseOral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Appellee, Fort Bend Independent School District.
08/26/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Michael Williams, et al. filed on behalf of The Governor of Texas, Greg Abbott.
08/26/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Dr. Ronald Johnson, Educator, in Support Of Texans For Real Equity and Efficiency in Education, et al.
08/25/2015Letter brief Appellant in caseLetter Brief filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD, et al.
08/25/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Raise Your Hand Texas, submitted by Mick Hatchell of Locke Lord LLP.
08/25/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Senator Phill Gramm and Stacy Hock in Support of Efficiency Intervenors.  
08/21/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curia Brief in Support of Texans for Real Equity filed on behalf of David R. Upham.
08/21/2015Amended Brief filedReceived (instead of filed)Amended Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of Robert M. Schoolfield, et al.
08/21/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Americans for Prosperity as Amici Curiae in Support of Appellants/Cross-Appellees. Submitted by Roger B. Borgelt of Borgelt Law of Austin, Texas.
08/21/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Robert Henneke.
08/18/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The U.S. Pastor Council.
08/17/2015Corrected BriefReceived (instead of filed)Corrected Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of The Goldwater Institute.
08/17/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of The Goldwater Institute.
08/14/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of Dr. Forrest E. Watson.
08/14/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of Robert M. Schoolfield, et al.
08/12/2015Reply BriefIntervenorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Efficiency Intervenors.
08/11/2015Reply BriefAppellant in caseReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al.
08/11/2015Reply BriefAppellee in caseReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD.
08/11/2015Reply BriefAppellant in caseReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Appellants Michael Williams, et al.
08/11/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Center for Public Policy Priorities, Education Law Center, Mexican-American School Board Members Assoc., San Antonio Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Texas Appleseed, Texas Assoc. for Bilingual Education, Texas Hope, and Texas NAACP. Submitted by Brian Bishop of Austin, Texas.
08/10/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amended Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Institute for Education Reform.
08/10/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Albert Kauffman.
08/07/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Appellants Texans for Real Equity and Efficiency in Education and Texas Association of Business, et al. filed on behalf of James Windham and Texas Institute for Education Reform.
08/06/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of John Merrifield submitted by Eric N. Green, Texas Bar No. 08349800, green14231@gmail.com, LAW OFFICES OF ERIC N. GREEN, 7455 Natural Bridge Caverns Road, Schertz, Texas 78154-3210, (210) 564-3220 / (210) 564-3203 fax.
07/21/2015Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter submitted by and on behalf of Paul F. Koeltzow.
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseBrief of Appellees Edgewood ISD Independent School District, et. al.
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseEdgewood ISD Appellees/Cross-Appellees’ Brief in Response to Calhoun County ISD Cross-Appellants’ and State Appellants’ Brief Regarding Financial Efficiency Judgment
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseCalhoun County ISD Plaintiffs’ Brief on the Merits
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsJoint motion filedISD Plaintiffs’ Combined Appellees’ Brief in Response to Intervenors’ Brief of Appellants. On behalf of Calhoun ISD, et al., Fort Bend ISD, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., Tex. TaxPayer & Student Fairness Coalition (TTSFC), et al.
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseBrief on the Merits of Cross-Appellees Michaels Williams, et al.
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseBrief of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al. in Response to Brief of State Defendants.
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseAppllees' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Fort Bend ISD.
07/02/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseAppellees/Cross-Appellees, The Texas Taxpayer and Student Fairness Coalition, et al.s' Brief.
04/29/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedAppellant in caseExhibit 11470 of Reporter's Record filed in Excel format.  Filed on behalf of Michael Williams.
04/13/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Joyce Coleman, et al.
04/13/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD.
04/13/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Charter School Association, et al.
04/13/2015Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAppellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael Williams.
10/09/2014Direct Appeal filedAppellant in caseCross - Direct Appeal #4 filed on behalf of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al.
10/06/2014Direct Appeal filedAppellant in caseCross - Direct Appeal #3 filed on behalf of Joyce Coleman, et al.
10/03/2014Direct Appeal filedAppellant in caseCross - Direct Appeal #2 filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD, et al.
09/26/2014Direct Appeal filedAppellant in caseNotice of Direct Appeal filed on behalf of Michael Williams, Commissioner of Education, in his official capacity, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/24/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/18/2016Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks The Court has corrected the opinion by removing the following sentence from page 88, “Unlike school districts, some charter schools are for-profit and presumably earn a profit.”
(5/18/2016 2:21:44 PM) 140776.pdf
05/13/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/13/2016Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Boyd delivered a concurring opinion, in which Justice Lehrmann and Justice Devine joined.
05/13/2016Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Guzman delivered a concurring opinion, in which Justice Lehrmann joined.
05/13/2016Opinion issuedIssued 
05/13/2016Opinion issuedIssued 
05/13/2016Opinion issuedIssued 
05/13/2016Opinion issuedTRIAL COURT IS AFF/PT AND REV/PTThe Court affirms in part and reverses in part the trial court's judgment, renders judgment in part and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Willett delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/17/2016 12:06:32 PM) 14-0776.jmt.pdf, 140776.pdf, 140776c1.pdf, 140776c2.pdf
03/28/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Supplement to Brief of the Texas Public Policy Foundation in Support of Efficiency Intervenors.
02/01/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Kirby Huffman.
02/01/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Kristi Hassett.
01/18/2016Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al., notifying the court that Loenard J. Schwartz is no longer with his previous office and should be withdrawn as counsel of record.
01/07/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Michael Q. McShane Ph.D.
10/07/2015Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
09/16/2015Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief submitted on behalf of Appellees Fort Bend ISD, et al., Calhoun County ISD, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., and the Texas Taxpayer and Student Fairness Coalition, et al.
09/08/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae brief, filed on behalf of Zaakir Tameez and Amy Fan.
09/01/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees by Scott A. Keller, Rance Craft, and Beth Klusmann; Argued on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellants The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition by Richard E. Gray, III; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Calhoun Co. ISD, by Mark Trachtenberg; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Edgewood ISD, by Marisa Bono; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Ft. Bend ISD, by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Tx Charter Schools Ass'n, by James C. Ho and Denise Pierce; Argued on behalf of Intervenors by Craig T. Enoch
09/01/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees by Scott A. Keller, Rance Craft, and Beth Klusmann; Argued on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellants The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition by Richard E. Gray, III; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Calhoun Co. ISD, by Mark Trachtenberg; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Edgewood ISD, by Marisa Bono; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Ft. Bend ISD, by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Tx Charter Schools Ass'n, by James C. Ho and Denise Pierce; Argued on behalf of Intervenors by Craig T. Enoch
09/01/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees by Scott A. Keller, Rance Craft, and Beth Klusmann; Argued on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellants The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition by Richard E. Gray, III; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Calhoun Co. ISD, by Mark Trachtenberg; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Edgewood ISD, by Marisa Bono; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Ft. Bend ISD, by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Tx Charter Schools Ass'n, by James C. Ho and Denise Pierce; Argued on behalf of Intervenors by Craig T. Enoch
09/01/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of Appellants/Cross-Appellees by Scott A. Keller, Rance Craft, and Beth Klusmann; Argued on behalf of Appellee/Cross-Appellants The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition by Richard E. Gray, III; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Calhoun Co. ISD, by Mark Trachtenberg; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Edgewood ISD, by Marisa Bono; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants, Ft. Bend ISD, by Wallace B. Jefferson; Argued on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Tx Charter Schools Ass'n, by James C. Ho and Denise Pierce; Argued on behalf of Intervenors by Craig T. Enoch
09/01/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae brief, filed on behalf of the Pastors for Texas Children, by David Russell of Templeton, Smithee, Hayes, Heinrich & Russell, LLP.
09/01/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibit of Joyce Coleman, et al.
08/31/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Appellee, Fort Bend Independent School District.
08/26/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Michael Williams, et al. filed on behalf of The Governor of Texas, Greg Abbott.
08/26/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Dr. Ronald Johnson, Educator, in Support Of Texans For Real Equity and Efficiency in Education, et al.
08/25/2015Letter brief  Letter Brief filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD, et al.
08/25/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Raise Your Hand Texas, submitted by Mick Hatchell of Locke Lord LLP.
08/25/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Senator Phill Gramm and Stacy Hock in Support of Efficiency Intervenors.  
08/21/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Americans for Prosperity as Amici Curiae in Support of Appellants/Cross-Appellees. Submitted by Roger B. Borgelt of Borgelt Law of Austin, Texas.
08/21/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curia Brief in Support of Texans for Real Equity filed on behalf of David R. Upham.
08/21/2015Amended Brief filed Amended Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of Robert M. Schoolfield, et al.
08/21/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Robert Henneke.
08/18/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of The U.S. Pastor Council.
08/17/2015Corrected Brief Corrected Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of The Goldwater Institute.
08/17/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of The Goldwater Institute.
08/14/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of Robert M. Schoolfield, et al.
08/14/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al. Oral argument will be presented by Scott A. Keller, Rance Craft, and Beth Klusmann.
08/14/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Efficiency Intervenors filed on behalf of Dr. Forrest E. Watson.
08/14/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion of Appellants for Leave to Have Three Attorneys Argue granted
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clint Bolick is granted.
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedRobert Henneke's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clint Bolick is granted.
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Robert Henneke's Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clint Bolick.
08/13/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Exceed word limit for Reply Brief filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al. has been granted.
08/13/2015Phone call from Clerk's Office Mr. Bolick's paralegal will resubmit the Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice seperately so that the fee is paid.
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Resident Practicing Attorney, Brian W. Bishop,  in Support of the Motion by Non-Resident Attorney Alexander S. Elson for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander S. Elson is granted.
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Resident Practicing Attorney, Brian W. Bishop, in Support of the Motion by Non-Resident Attorney Lynn B. Bayard for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
08/13/2015Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lynn B. Bayard is granted.
08/12/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Efficiency Intervenors.
08/12/2015Motion for leave to file brief disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief Exceeding Word Limits filed on behalf of Efficiency Intervenors has been granted.
08/11/2015Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion to Exceed word limit for Reply Brief filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
08/11/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Appellants Michael Williams, et al.
08/11/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by James C. Ho (opening) of Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP and Denise Pierce (rebuttal) of Texas Charter Schools Association.
08/11/2015Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance - Denise Pierce with Texas Charter Schools Associaiton will appear as counsel of record.
08/11/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al.
08/11/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD.
08/11/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Center for Public Policy Priorities, Education Law Center, Mexican-American School Board Members Assoc., San Antonio Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Texas Appleseed, Texas Assoc. for Bilingual Education, Texas Hope, and Texas NAACP. Submitted by Brian Bishop of Austin, Texas.
08/11/2015Motion for leave to file brief Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief Exceeding Word Limits filed on behalf of Efficiency Intervenors'.
08/11/2015Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion of Appellants Michael Williams, et al., for Leave to Have Three Attorneys Argue
08/10/2015Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record Supplement to Record sent to our office by Travis County and filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
08/10/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amended Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Institute for Education Reform.
08/10/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Albert Kauffman.
08/07/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Appellants Texans for Real Equity and Efficiency in Education and Texas Association of Business, et al. filed on behalf of James Windham and Texas Institute for Education Reform.
08/07/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Mr. Bolick.  Requested that the Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is filed seperately so that the fee is paid.
08/07/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chris Bolick submitted on behalf of Goldwater Institute.
08/07/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Resident Practicing Attorney, Brian W. Bishop,  in Support of the Motion by Non-Resident Attorney Alexander S. Elson for Admission Pro Hac Vice.
08/07/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander S. Elson on behalf of Amicus Center for Public Policy Priorities.
08/07/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Motion of Resident Practicing Attorney, Brian W. Bishop, in Support of the Motion by Non-Resident Attorney Lynn B. Bayard for Admission Pro Hac Vice.
08/07/2015Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lynn B. Bayard on behalf of Amicus Center for Public Policy Priorities.
08/07/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 1, 2015.
Time allotted to argue: State Defendants will be allowed 45 minutes opening for oral submission. Intervenors and Charter Plaintiffs will each be allowed 10 minutes opening for oral submission. ISD Plaintiffs will be allowed 60 minutes total for oral submission. State Defendants will be allowed 15 minutes rebuttal for oral submission.
Intervenors and Charter Plaintiffs will each be allowed 5 minutes rebuttal for oral submission.
08/06/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of John Merrifield submitted by Eric N. Green, Texas Bar No. 08349800, green14231@gmail.com, LAW OFFICES OF ERIC N. GREEN, 7455 Natural Bridge Caverns Road, Schertz, Texas 78154-3210, (210) 564-3220 / (210) 564-3203 fax.
08/06/2015Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of Eric Green: August 7, 2015 through August 15, 2015.
08/05/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Mr. Craig T. Enoch on behalf of the Efficiency Intervenors.
08/04/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Form received on behalf of Edgewood ISD Plaintiffs. Oral Argument Will Be Presented By Marisa Bono of  MALDEF of San Antonio, Texas
08/03/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Form received on behalf of The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition Plaintiffs. Oral Argument Will Be Presented By Richard E. Gray III of Gray & Becker, P.C. of Austin, Texas
08/03/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Mark Trachtenberg on behalf of Calhous ISD, et al.
08/03/2015Letter Filed Letter in regard to the Order of Oral Argument filed on behalf of Charter Schools.
08/03/2015Letter Filed Letter in Response to the Court’s July 31 notice inviting the parties to provide their views on oral argument. On behalf of Texans for Real Efficiency and Equity in Education, Texas Association of Business, Joyce Coleman, Danessa Bolling, Lee and Allena Beall, Joel and Andrea Smedshammer, Darlene Menn, and their children.
08/03/2015Letter Filed Letter in Response to the Court’s July 31 notice inviting the parties to provide their views on oral argument. Filed jointly on behalf of Appellees Fort Bend ISD, et al., Calhoun County ISD, et al., The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition, et al., and Edgewood ISD, et al.
08/03/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Wallace B. Jefferson on behalf of Fort Bend ISD, et al.
08/03/2015Letter Filed Letter in Response to the Court’s July 31 notice inviting the parties to provide their views on oral argument. On behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
07/31/2015Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent to Parties requesting they provide the Court with views on oral argument in this case by filing a letter no later than Friday, August 14, 2015, stating how much total time is needed for oral argument and how that time should be allotted to the parties.
07/21/2015Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter submitted by and on behalf of Paul F. Koeltzow.
07/20/2015CD / Flash Drive Filed USB drive that contains the completed project of the native files at the request of the Supreme Court and the parties; also, it is included the corrected Exhibit 11470 pursuant to the Agreed Motion to Correct the Record which the Supreme Court  has granted.
07/16/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedISD Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Appellees' Briefs Exceeding the Word Limits granted
07/16/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion of Cross-Appellees Michael Williams, et al, for Leave to File a Brief Exceeding the Word Limit granted
07/10/2015Electronic communication received from Party Received electronic communication from Counsel Rance Craft regarding Letter sent to District Clerk-Travis County in reference to "Defendants’ Renewed Request For Preparation Of Supplemental Clerk’s Record." On behalf of Michael Williams, Commissioner of Education, et al.
07/09/2015Letter Filed Letter from Court Reporter Della M. Rothermel indicating she completed the project of reorganizing the native files at the request of the Supreme Court and the parties. Also, she have included the corrected Exhibit 11470 pursuant to the Agreed Motion to Correct the Record which the Supreme Court has granted.
07/03/2015Miscellaneous Motion ISD Plaintiffs’ Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Appellees’ Briefs Exceeding the Word Limits. On behalf of On behalf of Calhoun ISD, et al., Fort Bend ISD, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., Tex. TaxPayer & Student Fairness Coalition (TTSFC), et al.
07/03/2015Motion to substitute disposedFiling grantedAgreed Correction of the Reporter's Record and Motion to Substitute Exhibit granted.
07/03/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 1, 2015.  The time allotted for this cause is yet to be determined.
07/03/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 1, 2015.  The time allotted for this cause is yet to be determined.
07/03/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 1, 2015.  The time allotted for this cause is yet to be determined.
07/03/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 1, 2015.  The time allotted for this cause is yet to be determined.
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Brief of Appellees Edgewood ISD Independent School District, et. al.
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Edgewood ISD Appellees/Cross-Appellees’ Brief in Response to Calhoun County ISD Cross-Appellants’ and State Appellants’ Brief Regarding Financial Efficiency Judgment
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Calhoun County ISD Plaintiffs’ Brief on the Merits
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits ISD Plaintiffs’ Combined Appellees’ Brief in Response to Intervenors’ Brief of Appellants. On behalf of Calhoun ISD, et al., Fort Bend ISD, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., Tex. TaxPayer & Student Fairness Coalition (TTSFC), et al.
07/02/2015Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion of Cross-Appellees to Exceed Briefing Word limit filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits of Cross-Appellees Michaels Williams, et al.
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Appllees' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Fort Bend ISD.
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Brief of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al. in Response to Brief of State Defendants.
07/02/2015Brief on the Merits Appellees/Cross-Appellees, The Texas Taxpayer and Student Fairness Coalition, et al.s' Brief.
07/01/2015Motion to Substitute filed Agreed Correction of the Reporter's Record and Motion to Substitute Exhibit filed on behalf of Texas Charter Schools Association.
06/04/2015CD / Flash Drive Filed USB Flash Drive containing Hyperlinked "Trial Record Guide," filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD, et al.
06/03/2015Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Robert A. Shulman will be on vacation July 1-19, 2015.
06/03/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Leave to Submit Hyperlinked “Trial Record Guide” On Flash Drive Via Hand Delivery granted.
06/02/2015Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to Submit Hyperlinked “Trial Record Guide” On Flash Drive Via Hand Delivery filed on behalf of  Appellees/Cross Appellants, Calhoun County ISD, et al. & Appellees, The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., and Fort Bend ISD, et al.
06/02/2015Letter Filed Letter to notify the Court that Appellees/Cross Appellants, Calhoun County ISD, et al. & Appellees, The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness Coalition, et al., Edgewood ISD, et al., and Fort Bend ISD, et al. have prepared and are submitting with the letter a spreadsheet to assist the Court with its review of the 63v Reporter's Rec.
05/01/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion of Appellants Michael Williams, et al. for Leave to File a Brief Exceeding the Word Limit granted
04/29/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Exhibit 11470 of Reporter's Record filed in Excel format.  Filed on behalf of Michael Williams.
04/29/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Submit the Correct Exhibit by Email is granted.  
04/29/2015Miscellaneous Motion Agreed Correction of the Reporter's Record and Unopposed Motion to Submit the Correct Exhibit by Email filed on behalf of Michael Williams.
04/14/2015Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion to Exceed Word Limit filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.
04/13/2015Brief on the Merits Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Joyce Coleman, et al.
04/13/2015Brief on the Merits Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD.
04/13/2015Brief on the Merits Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Charter School Association, et al.
04/13/2015Brief on the Merits Appellant's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael Williams.
04/10/2015Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney David Hinojosa and Substitution of Counsel granted.
03/31/2015Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to attorney David Hinojosa regarding Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney and Substution of Counsel.  Left voicemail.
03/30/2015Motion to Withdraw Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney David Hinojosa and Substitution of Counsel filed on behalf of Edgewood ISD
01/23/2015Direct Appeal disposedJurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. 
01/23/2015Direct Appeal Grant  
01/23/2015Direct Appeal Grant  
01/23/2015Direct Appeal disposedJurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. 
01/23/2015Direct Appeal disposedJurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. 
01/23/2015Direct Appeal Grant  
01/23/2015Direct Appeal disposedJurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. 
01/23/2015Direct Appeal Grant  
01/23/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion for Briefing Schedule granted.  Appellant brief is due no later than April 13, 2015; Appellee's brief is due July 2, 2015; Reply briefs due August 11, 2015.
01/16/2015Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance:  Wallace B. Jefferson (State Bar No. 00000019) and Rachel A. Ekery (State Bar No. 0078424), of Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP, 515 Congress Avenue, Suite 2350, Austin, Texas 78701-3562; Tel: (512) 482-9300. Fax: (512) 482-9303. On behalf of Appellees Fort Bend ISD, et al.
01/12/2015Electronic communication received from Party Received electronic communication from Della M. Rothermel, CRR Official Court Reporter, to notify the court that "all sides have paid."
01/09/2015Statement of Jurisidiction Statement of Jurisidiction filed on behalf of Cross Appellants Joyce Colemen party group.
01/08/2015Adoption by another party of brief already filed Texas Charter Schools Association, et al.’s Joinder to State’s Statement of Jurisdiction and Motion for Briefing Schedule
01/08/2015Adoption by another party of brief already filed Calhoun County ISD et al.’s Joinder to State’s Statement of Jurisdiction and Motion for Briefing Schedule
01/06/2015Clerk's Record Received Clerk's Record Parts I - XII from Travis County District Clerk's office.
01/06/2015Miscellaneous Motion Motion for Briefing Schedule filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.  INCORPORATED WITH STATEMENT OF JURISDICTION.
01/06/2015Statement of Jurisidiction Statement of Jurisidiction filed on behalf of Michael Williams, et al.  INCORPORATED WITH MOTION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE.
01/05/2015Notice received Notice of Automatic Substitution of Public Officer filed on behalf of Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts.
12/30/2014Electronic communication received from Party from Amalia Rodriguez-Mendoza, Clerk of the District Court, Travis County, indicating her office will send the clerk's record as soon as possible.
12/30/2014Electronic communication sent to Party Clerk of the Supreme sent an email to the district clerk, Amalia Rodriguez-Mendoza, and Chief Deputy Clerk, Michelle Brinkman, to notify them that the clerk's record is past due.
12/23/2014Court reporter/recorder's record Court Reporter's Record consisting of 303 Volumes with Exhibits
10/14/2014Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Leonard J. Schwartz will be on vacation October 27, 2014 - November 10, 2014.
10/09/2014Direct Appeal filed Cross - Direct Appeal #4 filed on behalf of Texas Charter Schools Association, et al.
10/06/2014Direct Appeal filed Cross - Direct Appeal #3 filed on behalf of Joyce Coleman, et al.
10/03/2014Direct Appeal filed Cross - Direct Appeal #2 filed on behalf of Calhoun County ISD, et al.
09/26/2014Direct Appeal filed Notice of Direct Appeal filed on behalf of Michael Williams, Commissioner of Education, in his official capacity, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/24/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Greenville I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Galena Park I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
San Antonio I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Carathage I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Lamar Consolidated I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Calhoun County I.S.D.AppelleeMr. John William Turner  
Mr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Texas State Board of EducationAppellantMr. Rance L. Craft
Round Rock I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Randy Pittenger (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Balmorhea I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Shelby Davidson (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Education Law CenterAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
Graford I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Texas Association of Business (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Edgewood I.S.D.AppelleeMs. Marisa Bono
Mr. David G. Hinojosa
Mr. Roger L. Rice
Celina Moreno
Angleton I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Texas Parents UnionAmicus CuriaeJodi Bender
Yolanda Canales (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
Royal I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Lee Beall (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Hegar, Glenn AppellantMr. Rance L. Craft
Pearland I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Allen I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
U.S. Pastor CouncilAmicus CuriaeMr. Briscoe Cain III
Dana Allen (Tex. Charter Schs. Assoc. party group)AppelleeMr. Robert Allen Schulman
La Feria I.S.D. (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
The Texas Taxpayer & Student Fairness CoalitionAppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Mr. Doug W. Ray
Ms. Toni Hunter
Mr. Richard Gray IV
Mr. Randall Buck Wood
Texans for Real Efficiency and Equity in Education (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Kauffman, Albert Amicus CuriaeAlbert Kauffman
Mexican-American School Board Members AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
Little Elm I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Hillsboro I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Dallas I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Schertz-Cibolo-Universal City I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Pastors for Texas ChildrenAmicus CuriaeMr. David M. Russell
Alief I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Woodville I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Texas HopeAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
Clear Creek I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Tameez, Zaakir Amicus CuriaeZaakir Tameez
Jessica Romero (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
Pasadena I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Araceli Vasquez (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
New Caney I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
McKinney I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Allena Beall (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Van I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Texas Association for Bilingual EducationAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
Joel Smedshammer (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Stafford Municipal I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Texans for Parental Choice in EducationAmicus CuriaeJodi Bender
Waco I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Watson, Forrest E.Amicus CuriaeMr. Andrew B. Piel
Coppell I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Spring Branch I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Senator Phill Gramm and Stacy HockAmicus CuriaeMr. Adam H. Charnes
Sheldon I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Merrifield, JohnAmicus CuriaeMr. Eric N. Green
Bluff Dale I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Keller I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Williams, MichaelAppellantMr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
Mr. Evan S. Greene
Mr. Kristofer S. Monson
Ms. Nichole Beth Bunker-Henderson
Mr. Rance L. Craft
Ms. Shelley Nieto Dahlberg
Mr. Daniel T. Hodge
Ms. Beth E. Klusmann
Johnson, C.Ph.D., Ronald Amicus CuriaeDr. Ronald Johnson, C.Ph.D.
Leggett I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Beaumont I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Sudan I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Paris I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Mario Flores (Tex. Charter Schs. Assoc. party group)AppelleeMr. Robert Allen Schulman
Perrin-Whitt Consolidated I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Aransas County I.S.D. (Calhoun Co. ISD party group)AppelleeMr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Rockdale I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Sarah Christensen (Tex. Charter Schs. Assoc. party group)AppelleeMr. Robert Allen Schulman
Jason Christensen (Tex. Charter Schs. Assoc. party group)AppelleeMr. Robert Allen Schulman
Texas NAACPAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
College Station I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Texas Institute for Education ReformAmicus CuriaeMr. Warren V. Norred
Quinlan I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Norman Baker (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Rice Consolidated I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Brazosport I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Austin I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Ector County I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Schoolfield, Robert M.Amicus CuriaeJodi Bender
North East I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Upham, DavidAmicus CuriaeDavid Upham
Christopher Baerga (Tex. Charter Schs. Assoc. party group)AppelleeMr. Robert Allen Schulman
Splendora I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Liberty I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group) AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
La Marque I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Danessa Bolling (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
McShane, PhD, Michael Q.Amicus CuriaeMr. Michael Q. McShane PhD
Texas Coalition for Parental Choice in EducationAmicus CuriaeJodi Bender
Amarillo I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Cleveland I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Pflugerville I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Kerrville I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Raise Your Hand TexasAmicus CuriaeMs. Susan A. Kidwell
Robert Bruce Laboon
Mr. Charles R. 'Skip' Watson Jr.
Mr. Mike A. Hatchell
Crosby I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Channelview I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Kenedy I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Arturo Robles (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
Kingsville I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Pleasant Grove I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Goldwater InstituteAmicus CuriaeMr. Robert Earl Henneke
Clint Bolick
Pine Tree I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Damon I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Hutto I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Koeltzow, Paul F.Amicus Curiae 
Brooks Flemister (Tex. Charter Schs. Assoc. party group)AppelleeMr. Robert Allen Schulman
Lewisville I.S.D. (Calhoun Co. ISD party group)AppelleeMr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Center for Public Policy PrioritiesAmicus CuriaeAlexander S. Elson
Mr. Brian W. Bishop
Lynn B. Bayard
Klein I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Abernathy I.S.D. (Calhoun Co. ISD party group)AppelleeMr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Decatur I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Trent I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Weatherford I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Deer Park I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Goose Creek Consolidated I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Fort Bend I.S.D.AppelleeMs. Rachel A. Ekery  
Mr. Philip D. Fraissinet
Ms. Holly Gene McIntush  
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Mr. John David Thompson
Windham, JamesAmicus CuriaeMr. Warren V. Norred
Stamford I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Frisco I.S.D. (Calhoun Co. ISD party group)AppelleeMr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Midland I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Canutillo I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Albany I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Harlingen Consolidated I.S.D. (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
Nacogdoches I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Abbott, GregAmicus CuriaeMr. Adam W. Aston
Lake Worth I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
West Orange Cove Consolidated I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Troup I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Sweeny I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Northside I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
San Antonio Hispanic Chamber of CommerceAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
Texas Public Policy FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. Robert Earl Henneke
Pampa I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Andrea Smedshammer (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Texas Charter School AssociationAppelleeDenise Pierce  
Mr. Joseph E. Hoffer  
Mr. James C. Ho
Mr. Robert Allen Schulman
Dumas I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Duncanville I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Elgin I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
McAllen I.S.D. (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
Santa Fe I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group) AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Richardson I.S.D. (Calhoun Co. ISD party group)AppelleeMr. Mark R. Trachtenberg
Cypress-Fairbanks I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
La Porte I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Abilene I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Texas Education AgencyAppellantMr. Rance L. Craft
Sharyland I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Brad King (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Darlene Menn (Coleman party group)AppelleeMr. James Christopher Diamond
Prewett, MattAmicus CuriaeJodi Bender
Americans for ProsperityAmicus CuriaeMr. Roger B. Borgelt
Francis-Benson, PamelaAmicus CuriaeJodi Bender
Hassett, Kristi Amicus CuriaeMs. Kristi Hassett
Texas AppleseedAmicus CuriaeMr. Brian W. Bishop
San Benito Consolidated I.S.D. (Edgewood ISD party group)AppelleeMr. David G. Hinojosa
Corsicana I.S.D. (Fort Bend ISD party group)AppelleeMr. John David Thompson
Coleman, JoyceAppelleeMs. Shelby L. O'Brien  
Mr. James Christopher Diamond
Ms. Melissa A. Lorber
Mr. Craig T. Enoch
Chip Langston (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Taylor I.S.D. (Tex. Taxpayer & Fairness Coal. party group)AppelleeMr. Richard E. Gray III
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
200th District Court 
Travis 
Honorable John K. Dietz 
D-1-GN-11-003130 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site