Supreme Court

Case: 14-0732    
14-0732
09/16/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
MICHAEL MCINTYRE AND LAURA MCINTYRE, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEIR CHILDREN, K.M., L.M., C.M., M.M., AND L.M. 
EL PASO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, DR. LORENZO GARCIA, AND MARK MENDOZA 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/13/2016Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitionerResponse to Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund Amicus Brief field on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
09/09/2016Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentReply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Paso Independent School District.
09/06/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund in Support of Motion for Rehearing.  Submitted by Lisa Brown of Thompson & Horton LLP, Houston, Texas.
08/29/2016Response to Motion for RehearingPetitionerResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
08/10/2016Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Paso Independent School District, et al.
11/13/2015Post submission brief filedRespondentReply to Petitioners' Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of El Paso I.S.D., et al.
11/13/2015Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Brief, filed on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
11/12/2015Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Brief, filed on behalf of El Paso ISD.
10/30/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentRespondent's Oral Argument Exhibits, filed on behalf of El Paso ISD.
08/10/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Assoication of Texas Professioanl Educators. Submitted by Richard Arnett with Brim, Arnett & Robinett, P.C. of Austin, TX.
08/05/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund in Support of Respondent.  Submitted by Lisa Brown of Thompson & Horton LLP, Houston, Texas.
08/02/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
06/26/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of El Paso Independent School District, et al.
04/09/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
02/04/2015Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
01/21/2015Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of El Paso I.S.D., et al.
10/06/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/27/2017Record returned to Court of Appeals Record Returned to 8th Court of Appeals
10/21/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
10/21/2016Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
09/13/2016Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund Amicus Brief field on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
09/09/2016Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Paso Independent School District.
09/06/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund in Support of Motion for Rehearing.  Submitted by Lisa Brown of Thompson & Horton LLP, Houston, Texas.
08/29/2016Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
08/24/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due September 2, 2016.
08/24/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
08/11/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than August 26, 2016.
08/10/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/10/2016Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Paso Independent School District, et al.
07/01/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due on August 10, 2016.
07/01/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of El Paso ISD, et al.
06/24/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/24/2016Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Green delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Johnson and Justice Brown joined.
06/24/2016Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirm and reverse in part; remand to court of appealsThe Court affirms in part and reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court. Justice Devine delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Willett, Justice Guzman, Justice Lehrmann, and Justice Boyd joined.
(6/24/2016 4:21:55 PM) 140732d.pdf, 140732.pdf, 14-0732 jmt.pdf
11/13/2015Post submission brief filed Reply to Petitioners' Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of El Paso I.S.D., et al.
11/13/2015Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief, filed on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
11/12/2015Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief, filed on behalf of El Paso ISD.
11/02/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Charles "Chad" Baruch; Argued on behalf of respondent by S. Anthony Safi
10/30/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Respondent's Oral Argument Exhibits, filed on behalf of El Paso ISD.
09/30/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Sent an email to counsel for respondents regarding refiling the struck Oral Argument Submission Form, counsel said it would be filed by the end of the week.
09/14/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission for filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Charles "Chad" Baruch, of Johnston Tobey P.C.
09/08/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission form filed on behalf of El Paso ISD et al. Oral Argument will be presented by S. Anthony Safi of Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxon & Galatzan.
09/04/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 2, 2015.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/04/2015Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/04/2015Petition for Review granted  
08/10/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Assoication of Texas Professioanl Educators. Submitted by Richard Arnett with Brim, Arnett & Robinett, P.C. of Austin, TX.
08/05/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund in Support of Respondent.  Submitted by Lisa Brown of Thompson & Horton LLP, Houston, Texas.
08/02/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
07/21/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al. has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Reply brief is due August 3, 2015.
07/21/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
07/06/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due July 24, 2015.
07/06/2015Electronic communication sent to Party E-mail sent to Mr. Baruch, counsel for Petitioners, regarding motion for extension of time to file reply brief on the merits. Motion incorrectly stated filing deadline; Mr. Baruch responded clarifying that motion seeks ten day extension to July 24th, 2015.
07/06/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
06/26/2015Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of El Paso Independent School District, et al.
05/22/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Resp's Brief is due June 29, 2015; Pet's Reply Brief is due July 14, 2015.
05/22/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of El Paso ISD, et al.
04/27/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedFirst Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is Granted; Response Brief is due May 29, 2015; Reply Brief due June 15, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
04/27/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of El Paso ISD, et al.
04/09/2015Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
03/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioner Michael McIntrye, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due April 9, 2015; Respondent's Brief is due April 29, 2015; Reply Brief is due May 14, 2015.
03/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioner Michael McIntrye, et al.
03/11/2015Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (3 V), supp clk's record (3 V), reporter's record (4 V - V 3 & 4 labeled as EXHIBITS),supp reporter's record (1 V), ant's br, appendix to ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, misc. folder(mos., orders & corres.), judgment & opinion
02/27/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 8th COA
02/27/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner brief due no later than March 30, 2015; Response brief due April 20, 2015; Reply brief due May 5, 2015.
02/04/2015Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
01/21/2015Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of El Paso I.S.D., et al.
12/19/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review on behalf of El Paso ISD, et al. GRANTED. Response is due January 21, 2015.
12/19/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review on behalf of El Paso ISD, et al.
11/21/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Review due on December 22, 2014.
10/21/2014Case forwarded to Court  
10/14/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of El Paso ISD, et al.
10/06/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Michael McIntyre, et al.
09/16/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due October 6, 2014.
09/16/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Michael McIntrye, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/21/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McIntyre, LauraPetitionerMr. Charles (Chad) E. Baruch
Mr. Thomas C. Sanders
Mr. Steven C. James
Mendoza, MarkRespondentMr. S. Anthony Safi
El Paso ISDRespondentMr. S. Anthony Safi
Association of Texas Professional EducatorsAmicus CuriaeMr. Richard L. Arnett
Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance FundAmicus CuriaeMs. Lisa A. Brown
Ms. Holly Gene McIntush  
Mr. John David Thompson III
McIntrye, MichaelPetitionerMr. Thomas C. Sanders
Mr. Charles (Chad) E. Baruch
Mr. Steven C. James
Garcia, LorenzoRespondentMr. S. Anthony Safi
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
457 SW3d 475, 08-06-14 
8th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Ann Crawford McClure 
Trial Court Information
327th District Court 
El Paso 
Honorable Linda Chew 
2007-3210 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site