Supreme Court

Case: 14-0572    
14-0572
07/24/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
COYOTE LAKE RANCH, LLC 
THE CITY OF LUBBOCK 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/02/2016Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of City of Lubbock.
04/14/2016Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefPetitionerReply to Response to Amicus Brief of Landowner Coalition of Texas filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch.
04/12/2016Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Amicus Brief of Landowner Coalition of Texas filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
02/09/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The Texas Municipal League and The Texas City Attorneys Association. Submitted by Dylan O. Drummond of Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP of Dallas, Texas.
12/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief filed on behalf of The Landowner Coalition of Texas. Submitted by Lisa Bowlin Hobbs with Kuhns Hobbs PLLC of Austin, Texas.
10/20/2015Letter brief PetitionerLetter Brief in Response to Lubbock's Post-Submission Letter filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch.
10/19/2015Post submission brief filedRespondentCity of Lubbock's Post Submission Letter Brief.
10/16/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed  
10/13/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerPetitioner's Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch LLC.
10/13/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentRespondent's Oral Argument Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
07/02/2015Surreply filedRespondentSur-Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
06/19/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
05/21/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
04/01/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC
03/12/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Respondent filed on behalf of Canadian River Municiapal Water Authority.
01/29/2015Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae of Texas Farm Bureau on Petition for Review.
12/19/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
12/05/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
11/18/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas & Southwestern Cattle Raisers Assoc'n and Texas Cattle Feeders Assoc'n submitted by Arthur G. Uhl III, State Bar No. 20371001, auhl@ufjblaw.com, UHL, FITZSIMONS, JEWETT & BURTON, PLLC
4040 Broadway Street, Suite 430, San Antonio, Texas 78209, Telephone: (210) 829-1660.
09/24/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/23/2016Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent to parties regarding revision to majority opinion issued May 27, 2016.  
(9/23/2016 6:23:15 PM) 140572.pdf
09/23/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
09/23/2016Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
08/02/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/02/2016Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of City of Lubbock.
07/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Reheairng is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Motion for Rehearing is due August 2, 2016.
07/11/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
06/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due on July 13, 2016.
06/13/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of City of Lubbock.
05/27/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/27/2016Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Boyd delivered a concurring opinion, in which Justice Willett and Justice Lehrmann joined.
05/27/2016Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court of affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Justice Green, Justice Johnson, Justice Guzman, Justice Devine, and Justice Brown joined. Justice Boyd delivered a concurring opinion, in which Justice Willett and Justice Lehrmann joined.
(5/27/2016 5:13:37 PM) 140572.pdf, 140572c.pdf
04/14/2016Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief Reply to Response to Amicus Brief of Landowner Coalition of Texas filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch.
04/12/2016Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Amicus Brief of Landowner Coalition of Texas filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
02/09/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The Texas Municipal League and The Texas City Attorneys Association. Submitted by Dylan O. Drummond of Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP of Dallas, Texas.
12/22/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of The Landowner Coalition of Texas. Submitted by Lisa Bowlin Hobbs with Kuhns Hobbs PLLC of Austin, Texas.
10/20/2015Letter brief  Letter Brief in Response to Lubbock's Post-Submission Letter filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch.
10/19/2015Post submission brief filed City of Lubbock's Post Submission Letter Brief.
10/16/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed  
10/14/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Rachel A. Ekery; Argued on behalf of respondent by Dale Wainwright
10/13/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioner's Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch LLC.
10/13/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Respondent's Oral Argument Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
10/09/2015Electronic communication sent to Party sent email to Trial Court Clerk and requested the original exhibits.
10/09/2015Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to to Direct Trial Court Clerk to Send Original Exhibits granted
10/06/2015Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion to to Direct Trial Court Clerk to Send Original Exhibits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
09/23/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Dale Wainwright of Bracewell & Guiliani LLP, filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
09/23/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Rachel A. Ekery, with Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend, filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
09/04/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 14, 2015.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/04/2015Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/04/2015Petition for Review granted  
07/02/2015Surreply filed Sur-Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
06/19/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
06/12/2015Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
05/29/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC. is Granted; Reply Brief is due June 19, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
05/28/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
05/21/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The City of Lubbock.
04/16/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent The City of Lubbock has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's Brief is due May 21, 2015; Petitioner's Reply Brief is due June 5, 2015.
04/16/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent The City of Lubbock.
04/01/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC
03/12/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Respondent filed on behalf of Canadian River Municiapal Water Authority.
02/04/2015Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/04/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Pet's Brief is due April 1, 2015; Resp's Brief is due April 21, 2015; Pet's Reply Brief is due May 6, 2015.
02/04/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC
02/02/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 7th COA
01/30/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 2, 2015; Response brief due March 23, 2015; Reply brief due April 7, 2015.
01/29/2015Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae of Texas Farm Bureau on Petition for Review.
12/19/2014Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
12/05/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
11/18/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas & Southwestern Cattle Raisers Assoc'n and Texas Cattle Feeders Assoc'n submitted by Arthur G. Uhl III, State Bar No. 20371001, auhl@ufjblaw.com, UHL, FITZSIMONS, JEWETT & BURTON, PLLC
4040 Broadway Street, Suite 430, San Antonio, Texas 78209, Telephone: (210) 829-1660.
11/07/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than December 8, 2014.  
10/07/2014Case forwarded to Court  
10/06/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of the City of Lubbock.
09/24/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC
07/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due September 24, 2014.
07/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Coyote Lake Ranch, LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/23/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored COA Record: G02 Row 3 H-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas & Southwestern Cattle Raisers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Arthur G. Uhl III
Coyote Lake Ranch, LLCPetitionerMs. Rachel A. Ekery  
Mr. Roger D. Townsend
Mr. Wallace B. Jefferson  
Mr. Cullom Brantley Jones
Mr. Marvin W. Jones
Ms. Amy Warr
Mr. Robert B. Dubose
Ms. Jennifer Ruth Josephson
The Land Owner Coalition of TexasAmicus CuriaeMs. Lisa B. Hobbs
Ms. Harriet O'Neill
Texas Farm BureauAmicus CuriaeMr. Daniel Nesbitt MacLemore IV
Mr. Andy McSwain
Canadian River Municipal Water AuthorityAmicus CuriaeMr. Doug Caroom
The Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Dylan O. Drummond
The Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. Dylan O. Drummond
The City of LubbockRespondentMr. Jeffrey C. Hartsell
Mr. Dale Wainwright  
Ms. Lindsay E. Hagans
Mr. Richard K. Casner
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 07-10-14 
7th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Mackey K. Hancock 
Trial Court Information
287th District Court 
Bailey 
Honorable Gordon H. Green 
9245 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site