Supreme Court

Case: 14-0534    
14-0534
07/09/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS 
GULF ENERGY EXPLORATION CORPORATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/30/2015Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
09/28/2015Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of the Railroad Commission.
09/21/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioner’s Oral Argument Exhibit. On behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
05/14/2015Surreply filedRespondentRespondent's Sur-Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf f Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
05/11/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
04/24/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
04/08/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
01/30/2015Petition Reinstated  
12/30/2014Surreply filedRespondentResponse to Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
12/23/2014Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerPetitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
12/16/2014Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
11/17/2014Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewPetitioner Railroad Commission of Texas' Motion for Rehearing.
09/18/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
09/02/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
08/13/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Railroad  Commission of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/11/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
01/29/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
01/29/2016Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court.
(1/29/2016 11:49:30 AM) 14-0534.jmt.pdf, 140534.pdf
09/30/2015Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
09/28/2015Post submission brief filed Post Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of the Railroad Commission.
09/22/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Joseph D. Hughes; argued on behalf of respondent by Kenneth R. Wynne
09/21/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioner’s Oral Argument Exhibit. On behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
07/21/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Joseph D. Hughes on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
07/20/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Kenneth R. Wynne on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corporation.
07/10/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 22, 2015.  Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
06/12/2015Petition for Review granted  
06/12/2015Petition for Review disposedFiling granted[Note: The date and time for oral argument is yet to be determined.]
05/14/2015Surreply filed Respondent's Sur-Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf f Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
05/11/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
04/24/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondent Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
04/08/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
03/30/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Railroad Commission of Texas has been granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's brief due April 8, 2015; Respondent's brief due April 28, 2015; Reply brief due May 13, 2015.
03/30/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Railroad Commission of Texas.
02/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioner Railroad Commission of Texas has been granted. Brief on the Merits is due April 1, 2015; Response Brief is due April 21, 2015; Reply Brief is due May 6, 2015.
02/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioner Railroad Commission of Texas.
02/05/2015Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (16 V), reporter's record (12 V - V12 labeled as EXHIBITS), ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, misc. folder (mos. & corres.), opinion, judgment
02/02/2015Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
01/30/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 2, 2015; Response brief due March 23, 2015; Reply brief due April 7, 2015.
01/30/2015Petition Reinstated  
01/30/2015Previous Order of the Court withdrawn Order denying petition for review on October 24, 2014 is withdrawn.
01/30/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
12/30/2014Surreply filed Response to Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
12/23/2014Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
12/16/2014Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
12/02/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response requested to motion for rehearing due no later than December 17, 2014.
11/18/2014Case forwarded to Court  
11/17/2014Motion for Rehearing Petitioner Railroad Commission of Texas' Motion for Rehearing.
11/06/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due November 17, 2014.
11/05/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
10/24/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/18/2014Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
09/09/2014Case forwarded to Court  
09/02/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gulf Energy Exploration Corp.
08/13/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Railroad  Commission of Texas.
07/09/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due August 13, 2014.
07/09/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Railroad Commission of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/11/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored COA Record: G02 Row 6 A-5 (6 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of TexasPetitionerMr. Joseph David 'Jody' Hughes
Mr. Jonathan F. Mitchell
Mr. Charles K. Eldred
Mr. J. R. Schneider Jr.
Mr. Gaston M. Broyles Jr.
Mr. Daniel T. Hodge
Attorney General Gregory W. Abbott
Gulf Energy Exploration CorporationRespondentMr. Kenneth R. Wynne
Mr. David Roberts
Mr. David E. Wynne
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
480 SW3d 570, 05-29-14 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rogelio Valdez 
Trial Court Information
267th District Court 
Calhoun 
Honorable Kemper Stephen Williams 
09-08-0809 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site