Supreme Court

Case: 14-0410    
14-0410
05/22/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
SYLVIA GALVAN 
MEMORIAL HERMANN HOSPITAL SYSTEM 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/2015Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
06/30/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Memorial Hermann Hospital System
05/14/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBrief on the Merits filed on behalf Sylvia Galvan.
08/20/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Memorial Herman Hospital System.
07/30/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/15/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost  Bill Issued
12/04/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
12/04/2015Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Per Curiam Opinion.
(12/4/2015 4:45:27 PM) 14-0410.jmt.pdf, 140410.pdf
12/04/2015Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
12/04/2015Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
07/20/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
06/30/2015Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Memorial Hermann Hospital System
05/27/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion to Extend Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Resp's Brief is due July 3, 2015; Pet's Reply Brief is due July 20, 2015.
05/27/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent’s Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Memorial Hermann Hospital System.
05/14/2015Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf Sylvia Galvan.
04/22/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Petitioner's brief is due May 14, 2015; Respondent's brief is due June 3, 2015; and Reply brief is due June 18, 2015.
04/22/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
03/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief due April 29, 2015; Respondent's brief due May 19, 2015; Reply brief due June 3, 2015.
03/23/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
02/27/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner brief due no later than March 30, 2015; Response brief due April 20, 2015; Reply brief due May 5, 2015.
11/17/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
11/17/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
08/26/2014Case forwarded to Court  
08/20/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Memorial Herman Hospital System.
07/30/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
07/23/2014Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThird Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition is granted. Petition is due July 30, 2014. No further extensions of time for this filing will be considered.
07/23/2014Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
06/16/2014Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petition for Review is due July 25, 2014.
06/16/2014Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
05/23/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Petition for Review is due June 25, 2014.
05/22/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Sylvia Galvan.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/15/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Memorial Hermann Hospital SystemRespondentMr. Frank N. Luccia
Mary M. Wagner
Galvan, SylviaPetitionerMr. Ryan Blake Gross
Mr. Ralph Peter Manginello
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 01-28-14 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Kem Thompson Frost 
Trial Court Information
61st District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Alfred H. Bennett 
2012-52629 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site