Supreme Court

Case: 14-0404    
14-0404
05/21/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
IN THE ESTATE OF THOMAS TREVINO ARAGUZ, III, DECEASED 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/17/2015Reply to ResponseRespondentReply in Support of Supplemental Brief filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
07/27/2015Response to Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Heather Delgado's Response to Respondent's Supplemental Brief on the Merits.
07/17/2015Supplemental Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Supplemental Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nikkie Araguz.
03/25/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitoner's Reply in Support of their Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Heather Delgado.
03/11/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
01/20/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Heather Delgado, et al.
12/01/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Heather Delgado, et al.
11/12/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz
06/27/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Heather Delgado.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/15/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
09/04/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
08/17/2015Reply to Response Reply in Support of Supplemental Brief filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
07/27/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Counsel for Respondent requesting that the Supplemental Brief be refiled with minors names redacted.
07/27/2015Response to Brief filed Petitioner Heather Delgado's Response to Respondent's Supplemental Brief on the Merits.
07/17/2015Supplemental Brief filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nikkie Araguz.
03/25/2015Reply Brief Petitoner's Reply in Support of their Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Heather Delgado.
03/11/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
02/05/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is Granted; Respondent's Brief is due March 11, 2015; Reply Brief is due March 26, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
02/05/2015Electronic communication received from Party Message received from Mr. Ellis, informing the Court that petitioner Simona Longoria is unopposed to the Motion for Extension of Time to file Respoondent's Brief on the Merits.
02/04/2015Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Chad Ellis, attorney to to petitioner Simona Longoria, regarding status towards Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits.
02/04/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed First Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
01/20/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Heather Delgado, et al.
01/15/2015Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (7V), supp clk's record (1V), reporter's record (1 V), ant's br, ape's br (Longoria), ape's br (Delgado -2), ant's reply br, ant's mo/re, misc. folder (mos. & corres.), judgment, opinion
12/23/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
12/19/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 20, 2015; Response brief due no later than February 9, 2015; Reply brief due February 24, 2015
12/01/2014Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Heather Delgado, et al.
11/12/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in address Counsel Alene Ross Levy's notice of change of address. On behalf of respondent, Nikki Araguz.
11/12/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz
10/28/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Response is due November 12, 2014.
10/28/2014Call received Spoke with Mr. Parker and he stated that they were not opposed to the second motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review.
10/28/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voice mail message with Kevin Parker asking if they were opposed or unopposed to the second motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review.
10/27/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
09/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. Requested Response is due October 29, 2014. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
09/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Nikki Araguz
08/29/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than September 29, 2014.
07/29/2014Case forwarded to Court  
07/16/2014Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Nikki Araguz.
06/27/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Heather Delgado.
05/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due June 30, 2014.
05/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Heather Delgado, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/15/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored COA Record: G02 Row 2 A-4 (3 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Araguz, NikkiRespondentMr. Darrell Mark Steidley
Mr. Kent G. Rutter
Mr. John Arthur Nechman
Ms. Alene Ross 'Allie' Levy
Mr. Mitchell Katine
Ms. Phyllis R Frye
Mr. Kenneth E. Broughton
Delgado, HeatherPetitionerMr. Frank E. Mann III
Mr. Kevin P. Parker
Ms. Natalie Van Houten Armour
Mr. W. Mark Lanier
Mr. Edward C. Burwell
Longoria, SimonaPetitionerChad Patrick Ellis
National Union Fire Insurance CompanyIntervenorMr. Phillip W. Bechter
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
443 SW3d 233, 02-13-14 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rogelio Valdez 
Trial Court Information
329th District Court 
Wharton 
Honorable Randy M. Clapp 
44,575 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site