Supreme Court

Case: 14-0372
05/14/2014
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE LON BURNAM 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/14/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelatorEmergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Lon Burman.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
08/05/2014Case Stored  e-stored
05/30/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedRefers to Petition for Writ of MandamusDenied with Justice not sitting.(Justice Brown not sitting)
05/28/2014Letter FiledReal Parties in Interest  Response Waiver filed on behalf of Ramon Romero, Jr.
05/23/2014Letter FiledReal Parties in Interest  Response Waiver filed on behalf of Stephen Vickers.
05/14/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Lon Burman.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/05/2014Case StoredCase stored. 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vickers, StephenReal Party in Interest Ms. Ann L. Diamond
Romero, Junior, RamonReal Party in Interest Mr. Jeffrey Whitfield  
Mr. Francisco Hernandez JR.
Mr. Marshall M. Searcy Jr.
Burman, LonRelatorMr. Randall Buck Wood
Mr. Doug W. Ray
Mr. Art Brender
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 05-12-14 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
96th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robert Bruce McFarling 
96-271239-14 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site