Supreme Court

Case: 14-0333    
14-0333
05/05/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
LOUISA D. REDDIC 
EAST TEXAS MEDICAL CENTER REGIONAL HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EAST TEXAS MEDICAL CENTER-CROCKETT, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/01/2015Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Louisa Reddic.
06/18/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of East Texas Medical Center-Crockett.
04/29/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Louisa D. Reddic.
08/11/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of East Texas Medical Center.
05/05/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Louisa D. Reddic
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/2015Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
10/30/2015Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record  
10/30/2015Opinion issuedjudgments below reversed/remanded tc f/settlementPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remand the case to the trial court.  Per Curiam
(11/2/2015 7:45:15 AM) 140333.pdf, 14-0333.jmt.pdf
10/30/2015Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
10/30/2015Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
07/01/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Louisa Reddic.
06/18/2015Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of East Texas Medical Center-Crockett.
05/18/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due June 18, 2015; and Reply brief is due July 3, 2015.
05/18/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of East Texas Medical Center-Crockett, Inc.
04/29/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Louisa D. Reddic.
03/16/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Louisa D. Reddice has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due April 29, 2015; Respondents' Brief is due May 19, 2015; Reply brief is due June 3, 2015.
03/16/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Louisa D. Reddice.
02/27/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner brief due no later than March 30, 2015; Response brief due April 20, 2015; Reply brief due May 5, 2015.
02/18/2015Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of the Change of Address, effective February 15, 2015, of the undersigned attorney of record, Mr. Russell G. Thornton. On behalf of East Texas Medical Center Regional Health Care System.
11/19/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
11/17/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 12th COA
08/11/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of East Texas Medical Center.
07/11/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response requested to the Petition for Review is due no later than August 11, 2014.
06/23/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of East Texas Medical Center Regional Healthcare System and East Texas Medical Center-Crockett.
06/10/2014Case forwarded to Court  
05/05/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office to petitioner's lead counsel, Marisa M. Schouten, to inquire about the Judgment. Ms. Schouten indicated that the court of appeals withdrew and replaced only the opinion and the judgment stayed the same (issued 12.04.13).
05/05/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Louisa D. Reddic
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/10/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
East Texas Medical Center Regional Health Care SystemRespondentMr. Russell G. Thornton
Reddic, Louisa D.PetitionerMr. William H. "Bill" Liebbe
Mr. Michael J. Hindman
Ms. Marisa M. Schouten
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
426 SW3d 343, 03-19-14 
12th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Brian Hoyle 
Trial Court Information
349th District Court 
Houston 
Honorable Pamela Foster Fletcher 
12-0060 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site