Supreme Court

Case: 14-0328
05/02/2014
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE TAILWIND SPORTS CORP. AND LANCE ARMSTRONG 
 
Trial Court Information
116th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Tonya Parker 
DC13-01564 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/02/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Tailwind Sports Corp.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionRemarksDocument
08/05/2014Case Stored  e-stored
05/30/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedRefers to Petition for Writ of MandamusDenied 
05/30/2014Motion to Stay Disposed DeniedMotion for Temporary Relief denied as supplemented
05/16/2014Supplement to Motion filedRelator Supplement to Motion for Temporary Relief Pending Determination of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Relators Tailwind Sports Corp. and Lance Armstrong.
05/07/2014Motion to Stay Filed Relator Motion for Temporarily Relief Pending Determination of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Tailwind Sports Corp.
05/02/2014Case Record Filed Relator Record, Volumes I-III, filed on behalf of Tailwind Sports Corp. and Lance Armstrong.
05/02/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Tailwind Sports Corp.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/07/2014Motion being reviewed by CourtMotion to stay 
08/05/2014Case StoredCase stored. 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tailwind Sports Corp.RelatorMr. D. Todd Smith
Mr. Sean E. Breen
Ms. Andrea Meshonn Brown
Mr. Michael K. Hurst
Ms. Brandy Wingate Voss  
Mr. Timothy J. Herman
SCA Promotions, Inc.Real Party in Interest Mr. Jeffrey M. Tillotson
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 04-24-14 
5th Court of Appeals 
Denied 
Honorable Kerry P. FitzGerald 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site