Supreme Court

Case: 14-0315    
14-0315
04/11/2014
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
JOHN L. WRIGHT 
TEXAS MUTUAL INSURANCE 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed by John L. Wright, pro se.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/05/2014Case Stored e-stored
08/01/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
06/13/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
05/13/2014Case forwarded to Court  
04/11/2014Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Affidavit of Inability to Pay filed by John L. Wright, pro se.
04/11/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed by John L. Wright, pro se.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/05/2014Case StoredCase stored. 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wright, John L.PetitionerMr. John L. Wright
Texas Mutual InsuranceRespondentMs. Shannon Simmons Pounds
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismissed 
___ SW3d ___, 02-27-14 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Carolyn I. Wright 
Trial Court Information
134th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Dale B. Tillery 
DC-12-13703 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site