Supreme Court

Case: 14-0309    
14-0309
04/25/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LEONARD JAMES HAWKINS 
CITY OF DEER PARK 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/29/2014Response to Motion for RehearingRespondentResponse to motion for rehearing filed on behalf of The City of Deer Park.  
08/26/2014Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Leonard James Hawkins.
06/19/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Deer Park
05/20/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Leonard James Hawkins.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/07/2014Case Stored e-stored
10/07/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
10/03/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
09/02/2014Case forwarded to Court  
08/29/2014Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to motion for rehearing filed on behalf of The City of Deer Park.  
08/26/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Leonard James Hawkins.
08/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extesion of Time to file Motion for Rehearing is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due August 26, 2014.
08/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Leonard James Hawkins.
07/25/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
06/24/2014Case forwarded to Court  
06/19/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The City of Deer Park
05/20/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Leonard James Hawkins.
04/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due May 20, 2014
04/25/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Leonard James Hawkins. Requesting an additional 25 days until May 20, 2014.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/07/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hawkins, Leonard JamesPetitionerMr. Andrew C. Cook
Mr. Stephen P. Carrigan
Ms. Diane Marie St. Yves
David M. Anderson
City of Deer ParkRespondentMr. Steven D. Selbe
Ms. Heidi Jean Gumienny
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
___ SW3d ___, 03-11-14 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable William J. Boyce 
Trial Court Information
334th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Kenneth Price Wise 
2012-15808 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site