Supreme Court

Case: 14-0307    
14-0307
04/24/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
GLENN HEGAR, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, AND KEN PAXTON, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF TEXAS 
TITAN TRANSPORTATION, LP 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/24/2015Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al.
02/02/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Titan Transportation, LP.
12/12/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.
08/13/2014Reply to Response Reply filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas and Gregg Abbott, Attorney General of Texas
08/11/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Titan Transportation, LP
05/28/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/12/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
05/01/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
02/24/2015Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al.
02/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief due February 24, 2015.
02/12/2015Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Glenn Hegar, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al.
02/02/2015Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Titan Transportation, LP.
01/06/2015Notice received Notice of Substitution of parties filed on behalf of petitioners Glenn Hegar and Ken Paxton.
12/15/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Resp's Brief is due February 2, 2015; Pets' Reply Brief is due February 17, 2015.
12/15/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Titan Transportation, LP.
12/12/2014Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.
12/01/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due December 12, 2014; Respondent's brief is due January 2, 2015; and Reply brief is due January 20, 2015.
12/01/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.
10/21/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/16/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Petitioner's Brief is due December 3, 2014; Response Brief due December 29, 2014; Reply Brief due January 13, 2015. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/16/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas and Gregg Abbott, Attorney General of Texas.
10/06/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 3rd COA
10/03/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than November 3, 2014; Response brief due November 24, 2014; Reply brief due December 9, 2014.
08/13/2014Reply to Response Reply filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas and Gregg Abbott, Attorney General of Texas
08/11/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Titan Transportation, LP
07/11/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response requested to the Petition for Review is due no later than August 11, 2014.
06/10/2014Case forwarded to Court  
06/09/2014Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Titan Transportation, LP
05/28/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Combs, et al.
04/24/2014Amendment to Motion filed  Amended Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Susan Combs, et al.
04/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, and Greg Abbott, Attorney General of the State of Texas has been granted. Petition due May 28, 2014.
04/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Combs, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, and Greg Abbott, Attorney General of the State of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/20/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Paxton, Ken PetitionerMr. Daniel Tekstar Hodge
Mr. Robert B. O'Keefe
Mr. Charles K. Eldred
Mr. David C. Mattax
Ms. Cynthia Ann Morales
Titan Transportation, LPRespondentMs. Lacy L. Leonard
Mr. James F. Martens
Ms. Danielle V. Ahlrich
Ms. Amanda Garrett Taylor
Hegar, Glenn PetitionerMr. Charles K. Eldred
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 03-14-14 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable J. Woodfin 'Woodie' Jones 
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Lora J. Livingston 
D-1-GN-11-002866 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site