Supreme Court

Case: 14-0301    
14-0301
04/21/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
IN RE COMMITMENT OF JOSEPH TRUEMAN COUNCIL 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/11/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Joseph Trueman Council (1)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/10/2014Case Stored e-stored
09/09/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
08/01/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
07/01/2014Case forwarded to Court  
06/25/2014Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of State of Texas
06/12/2014Additional Copies received (1) received copy of petitioner's Affidavit of Indigency. On behalf of Joseph Council. *affidavit filed on 05-05-14 and incorporated with Appendix to Petition for Review.
06/11/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Joseph Trueman Council (1)
05/05/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due June 11, 2014
05/05/2014Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Affidavit to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.. On behalf of Joseph Trueman Council. (1)
04/24/2014Notice requesting filing fee $10 filing fee request letter sent to Mr. Joseph Council.
04/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Joseph Trueman Council. (1)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/10/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Council, Joseph TruemanPetitionerMs. Jennifer Furrow  
Mr. Barbara Louise Corley
Mr. Joseph Trueman Council
Mr. Thomas Brewer III
Mr. Kenneth D. Nash
State of TexasRespondentMs. Melinda M. Fletcher
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 03-27-14 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Hollis Horton  
Trial Court Information
435th District Court 
Montgomery 
Honorable Michael Thomas Seiler 
12-01-00207-CV 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site