Supreme Court

Case: 14-0269    
14-0269
04/10/2014
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
IN THE INTEREST OF A.K.M., J.D.M. AND D.D.M., CHILDREN 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/13/2014Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed by John Morgan.
04/10/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of John S. Morgan.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/2014Case Stored e-stored
07/18/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
06/17/2014Case forwarded to Court  
06/13/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed by John Morgan.
05/30/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
04/29/2014Case forwarded to Court  
04/25/2014Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Kathleen Morgan.
04/23/2014Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court disposed.Filing grantedPetitioner's Motion to Seal Three Appendices to Petition for Review granted
04/16/2014Sealed document filed in case Petition for Review with Sealed Appendix items filed on behalf of John S. Morgan.
04/15/2014Call received Clerk of the Ninth Court of Appeals called to inform the Clerk of the Court that Appendix 3 of the Petition for Review contained  a "summary of sealed records" which contains a summary of an interview between the trial court and the children. Clerk instructed staff to strike the petition and call counsel to inform him that this document must be filed under seal. Petition for review will be removed from the website.
04/14/2014Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court filed Motion to Seal filed on behalf of John Stephen Morgan.
04/10/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of John S. Morgan.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/30/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morgan, Kathleen WinslowRespondentMs. Sheryl B. Johnson-Todd
Morgan, John StephenPetitionerMr. John Stephen Morgan
Ms. Alene Ross 'Allie' Levy
Ms. Ashley V. Tomlinson
Ms. Laura D. Dale
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 02-27-14 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Steve McKeithen 
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court 
Jefferson 
Honorable Layne W. Walker 
F-201,904-H 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site