Supreme Court

Case: 14-0267    
14-0267
04/10/2014
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
TIM PRITCHETT 
GOLD’S GYM FRANCHISING, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/05/2014Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner Tim Pritchett's Reply Brief on the Merits.
11/20/2014Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gold's Gym Franchising LLC.
11/03/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Tim Pritchett.
08/15/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tim Pritchett.
08/01/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition filed on behalf of Gold's Gym Franchising, LLC.
04/10/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Tim Pritchett.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
01/30/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
12/05/2014Reply Brief Petitioner Tim Pritchett's Reply Brief on the Merits.
11/20/2014Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gold's Gym Franchising LLC.
11/03/2014Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Tim Pritchett.
10/16/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/06/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
10/03/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than November 3, 2014; Response brief due November 24, 2014; Reply brief due December 9, 2014.
08/15/2014Reply to Response Reply to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tim Pritchett.
08/01/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition filed on behalf of Gold's Gym Franchising, LLC.
06/17/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted.  Response is due August 6, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
06/17/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time for Response filed on behalf of Gold's Gym Franchising LLC.
06/06/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response requested to petition for review due no later than July 7, 2014.
05/06/2014Case forwarded to Court  
04/30/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Gold’s Gym Franchising LLC.
04/10/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tim Pritchett.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/12/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pritchett, TimPetitionerMr. Matthew W. Sparks
Mr. Jeffrey R. Sandberg
Gold's Gym Franchising, LLCRespondentMr. Eric D. Fein
Ms. Vickie Lynn Stephens Brandt
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 02-04-14 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Lana Rolf Myers 
Trial Court Information
162nd District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Phyllis Lister Brown 
DC-12-06623-I 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site