Supreme Court

Case: 14-0263    
14-0263
04/07/2014
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE KEVIN LEE GONZALES 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/18/2014Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Sandra Marie Gonzales.
04/07/2014Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorMandamus filed on behalf of Kevin Lee Gonzales.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/10/2014Case Stored e-stored
04/25/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedDenied 
04/25/2014Motion to Stay DisposedDeniedMotion for Emergency Temporary Relief denied
04/18/2014Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Sandra Marie Gonzales.
04/18/2014Response to Motion filed Response to Emergency Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Sandra Marie Gonzales.
04/18/2014Notice of Appearance Ebb B. Mobley is lead counsel for Sandra Marie Gonzales.
04/08/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to real party in interest's attorney, Jodi Lopez, to request response to both the emergency motion and the petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 4/18/14.  Left voicemail.
04/08/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to both the motion and the petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 4/18/14.
04/07/2014Motion to Stay Filed  Motion for Emergency Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Kevin Lee Gonzales.
04/07/2014Case Record Filed  Record filed on behalf of Kevin Lee Gonzales.
04/07/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus Mandamus filed on behalf of Kevin Lee Gonzales.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/10/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gonzales, Sandra MarieReal Party in Interest Mr. Ebb B. Mobley III
Ms. Jodi Head Lopez
Gonzales, Kevin LeeRelatorMs. Evelyn M. Martinez
Ms. Elizabeth Conry Davidson  
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 04-04-14 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Marialyn Price Barnard 
Trial Court Information
288th District Court 
Bexar 
Honorable John D. Gabriel 
2011-CI-13231 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site