Supreme Court

Case: 14-0253    
14-0253
04/02/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
KINGVISION PAY-PER-VIEW, GARDEN CITY BOXING CLUB, INC., AND ENTERTAINMENT BY J&J, INC. 
DALLAS COUNTY, TEXAS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/2014Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View, et al.
09/12/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to First Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View.
08/22/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to First Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dallas County District Attorney's Office
05/20/2014Amended Petition for Review filedPetitionerAmended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View.
05/06/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/22/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
01/09/2015Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
12/02/2014Case forwarded to Court  
11/24/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View, et al.
11/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Motion for Rehearing is due November 24, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-per-view, et al.
10/15/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Motion for Rehearing is due November 21, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/15/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-per-view, et al.
10/03/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
09/12/2014Reply to Response Reply to Response to First Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View.
09/08/2014MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Reply is due September 12, 2014.
09/08/2014Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View, et al.
08/22/2014Response to Petition Response to First Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dallas County District Attorney's Office
07/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due August 27, 2014.
07/21/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dallas County, Texas.
06/27/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response requested to petition for review due no later than July 28, 2014.
05/27/2014Case forwarded to Court  
05/22/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver (incoporated with Notice of Lead Counsel) filed on behalf of Dallas County.
05/22/2014Designation of Lead Counsel  Notice of Lead Counsel for Respondent City of Dallas (incorporated with Response Waiver). Lead counsel is Frank Waite.
05/20/2014Amended Petition for Review filed Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View.
05/20/2014Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition disposedFiling grantedMotion for Leave to File Amended Petition is granted.  
05/16/2014Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition filed Unopposed Motion to File Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View.
05/06/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View, et al.
04/02/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due May 6, 2014.
04/02/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kingvision Pay-Per-View, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/22/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kingvision Pay-Per-ViewPetitionerMr. Gregory Carr Noschese
Mr. Andrew R. Korn
Mr. John W. Bowdich
Mr. James L. Guinan
Mr. David Jefrie Mizgala
Garden City Boxing Club, Inc.PetitionerMr. Gregory Carr Noschese
Mr. Andrew R. Korn
Mr. David Jefrie Mizgala
Mr. James L. Guinan
Mr. John W. Bowdich
Entertainment by J&J, Inc.PetitionerMr. David Jefrie Mizgala
Mr. John W. Bowdich
Mr. Andrew R. Korn
Mr. Gregory Carr Noschese
Mr. James L. Guinan
Dallas County, TexasRespondentTeresa Guerra Snelson
Mr. Grant Hugh Brenna
Mr. Craig M. Watkins
Mr. Todd K. Sellars
Mr. Frank Waite
Barbara Sally Ann Nicholas
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___SW3d___, 02-20-14 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Elizabeth Lang-Miers 
Trial Court Information
116th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Tonya Parker 
07-11471-F 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site