Supreme Court

Case: 14-0223    
14-0223
03/24/2014
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
METHODIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF SAN ANTONIO, LTD., LLP D/B/A NORTHEAST METHODIST HOSPITAL 
THOMAS DEWEY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/05/2015Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioner Methodist Healthcare System of San Antonio, LTD.
04/20/2015Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Thomas Dewey
03/30/2015Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Methodist Healthcare System of San Antonio, Ltd., LLP.
07/15/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Petition filed on bhealf of Methodist Healthcare System.
06/30/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Thomas Dewey.
03/24/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Methodist Healtcare System of San Antonio.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/2015Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
06/19/2015Petition for Review disposedDenied 
05/05/2015Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Petitioner Methodist Healthcare System of San Antonio, LTD.
04/20/2015Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Thomas Dewey
03/30/2015Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Methodist Healthcare System of San Antonio, Ltd., LLP.
02/27/2015Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner brief due no later than March 30, 2015; Response brief due April 20, 2015; Reply brief due May 5, 2015.
11/18/2014Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
11/17/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
07/15/2014Reply to Response Reply to Petition filed on bhealf of Methodist Healthcare System.
06/30/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Thomas Dewey.
06/02/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due June 30, 2014.
06/02/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Thomas Dewey.
05/09/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than June 9, 2014.
04/15/2014Case forwarded to Court  
04/10/2014Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Thomas Dewey.
03/24/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Methodist Healtcare System of San Antonio.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/30/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Methodist Healthcare System of San Antonio, Ltd., LLPPetitionerMr. Robinson C. Ramsey
Ms. Lucretia R. Marmor
Dewey, ThomasRespondentMr. Steven G. Cennamo  
Mr. Stephen K. Luxton
J. Todd Malaise  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
423 SW3d 516, 02-05-14 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Marialyn Price Barnard 
Trial Court Information
408th District Court 
Bexar 
Honorable Solomon John Casseb 
2012-CI-12676 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site