Supreme Court

Case: 14-0200    
14-0200
03/17/2014
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE MICHEAL WAYNE BARNES 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/2014Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Michael Wayne Barnes.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/18/2014Case Stored e-stored
05/27/2014Letter Filed Letter requesting explanation of denial of petition filed on behalf of Micheal Wayne Barnes.
05/09/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedDenied 
04/08/2014Case forwarded to Court  
03/31/2014Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Affidavit of Inability to Pay filed by Micheal Barnes, pro se.
03/18/2014Notice requesting filing fee Sent fee request to relator for petition.
03/17/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Michael Wayne Barnes.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/18/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harris County Assistant District Attorney Maritza AntuReal Party in Interest Ms. Susan Marie Fillion
Barnes, Micheal WayneRelatorMr. Micheal Wayne Barnes
Court Appointed Defense Counsel Mary C. A. MooreReal Party in Interest Mr. Mary C. A. Moore  
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
1st Court of Appeals 
 
Trial Court Information
234th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Mauricio Rondon 
2013-21008 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site