Supreme Court

Case: 14-0186    
14-0186
03/13/2014
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
TV AZTECA, S.A.B. DE C.V., PATRICIA CHAPOY, AND PUBLIMAX, S.A. DE C.V. 
GLORIA DE LOS ANGELES TREVINO RUIZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF A MINOR CHILD, A.G.J.T., AND ARMANDO ISMAEL GOMEZ MARTINEZ 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/2016Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Faculty Members of University of Texas School of Law. Submitted by Senior Lecturer Ms.Alexandra Wilson Albright and Profesor in Law Mr. Patrick Woolley.
04/13/2016Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
10/09/2015Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerPetitioner's Oral Argument Exhibits, filed on behalf of TV Azteca et al.
12/30/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Brief filed on behalf of The National Association of Broadcasters in support of the petitioners.
12/19/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
12/11/2014Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
11/26/2014Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondents Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, et al.
11/10/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked version of petitioner's brief on the merits originally filed on October 22, 2014.
10/22/2014Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
08/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae Texas Association of Broadcasters in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Thomas S. Leatherbury of Vinson & Elkins LLP of Dallas Texas.
08/14/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked version of Reply in support of Petition for Review previously filed on Aug. 6, 2014. On behalf of TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
08/06/2014Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
07/07/2014Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz.
04/29/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filedPetitionerHyperlinked version of the Petition for Review that was filed on April 16, 2014. On behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
04/16/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/17/2016Letter Filed Petition for Writ of Certiorari was filed in the U.S. Supreme Court on October 7, 2016 and placed on the docket October 12, 2016 as No. 16-481.
09/02/2016Letter Filed Letter filed stating that an extension of time to file a petition for writ of certiorari has been filed in the U.S. Supreme Court.
06/24/2016Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedPetitioners' Motion to Withdraw and Stay Mandate denied
06/20/2016Reply to Response to Motion Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw and Stay Mandate filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
06/17/2016Response to Motion filed Response to Motion to Withdraw and Stay Mandate filed on behalf of Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, et al.
06/16/2016Motion to stay mandate filed. Motion to Withdraw and Stay Mandate filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
06/15/2016Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/10/2016Corrected opinion The Court's opinion issued February 26, 2016 is corrected.
06/10/2016Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
05/04/2016Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Faculty Members of University of Texas School of Law. Submitted by Senior Lecturer Ms.Alexandra Wilson Albright and Profesor in Law Mr. Patrick Woolley.
04/13/2016Case forwarded to Court  
04/13/2016Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
03/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al. has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due April 13, 2016.
03/09/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
02/29/2016Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarks Letter sent to parties with corrected opinion and notation saying, "The following correction has been made to page 3 of the first paragraph, beginning of the sentence on line 8, “The court of appeals affirmed the trial court’s judgment….” now reads as follows: “The court of appeals affirmed the trial court’s denial of the special appearances….”
(2/29/2016 4:44:11 PM) 140186.pdf
02/26/2016Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
02/26/2016Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment.  Justice Boyd delivered the opinion of the Court.
(2/26/2016 3:56:43 PM) 140186.pdf, 14-0186.jmt.pdf
10/12/2015Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Paul C. Watler; Argued on behalf of respondents by David H. Jones
10/09/2015Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioner's Oral Argument Exhibits, filed on behalf of TV Azteca et al.
10/08/2015Sealed document filed in case Sealed Document Exhibits 36-40 & Unredacted Original Affidavits of Paul C. Walter and James E. Morrison.
09/23/2015Letter Filed Paul C. Watler will be arguing for all Petitioners: TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., Patricia Chapoy, and Publimax, S.A. de C.V.
09/22/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Gloria De Los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, et al. Oral argument will be presented by David H. Jones of the Law Office of David H. Jones.
09/21/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission form filed on behalf of Publimax, S.A. de C.V. Oral Argument will be presented by Paul C. Watler, of Jackson Walker LLP.
07/10/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been reset for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 12, 2015.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/15/2015Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of Paul C. Watler filed on behalf of Publimax, S.A. de C.V. Mr. Watler will be out from August 22 - September 7, 2015; and September 25- September 30, 2015.
02/20/2015Motion to postpone submission date disposedFiling grantedPetitioners' Unopposed Emergency Motion for Continuance of Oral Argument Setting granted
02/19/2015Motion to postpone submission date filed Unopposed Emergency Motion for Continuance of Oral Argument Setting filed on behalf of TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V.
02/09/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Paul C. Watler of Jackson Walker, L.L.P. on behalf of TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., Patricia Chapoy, and Publimax S.A. de C.V.
02/06/2015Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument will be presented by David H. Jones, Law Office of David H. Jones on behalf of Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, Indiv. and on behalf of her minor children, A.T. & A.M.
01/30/2015Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 25, 2015.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes.
01/30/2015Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/30/2015Petition for Review granted  
12/30/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of The National Association of Broadcasters in support of the petitioners.
12/30/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Benjamin Ivins, counsel for the National Association of Broadcasters; Mr. Ivins was informed of the efiling requirments and neccessity for Texas representation or Motion Pro Hac Vice.
12/19/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
12/11/2014Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
11/26/2014Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Respondents Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, et al.
11/10/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of petitioner's brief on the merits originally filed on October 22, 2014.
11/03/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due November 26, 2014; and Reply brief is due December 11, 2014.
11/03/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, et al.
10/22/2014Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
09/15/2014Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (6 V), reporter's record (1 V), ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, misc. folder (mos. & correspondence). * Three volumes of supplemental clerk's record, opinion & judgment in electronic form.
08/27/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioners' brief is due October 22, 2014; Respondent's brief is due November 12, 2014; and Reply brief is due December 1, 2014.
08/27/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
08/25/2014Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
08/22/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brierf on the merits due no later than 9/22/14; Response brief due 10/13/14; Reply brief due 10/28/14.
08/21/2014Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae Texas Association of Broadcasters in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Thomas S. Leatherbury of Vinson & Elkins LLP of Dallas Texas.
08/14/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of Reply in support of Petition for Review previously filed on Aug. 6, 2014. On behalf of TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
08/06/2014Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
07/07/2014Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz.
06/30/2014MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review is Granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due August 6, 2014.
06/30/2014Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
06/06/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response requested to petition for review due no later than July 7, 2014.
05/29/2014Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Paul C. Walter will be out of the office the following dates: June 13-21, 2014; and July 7-21, 2014. Filed on behalf of Publimax, S.A. de C.V.
05/06/2014Case forwarded to Court  
05/01/2014Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Gloria de los Angeles Trevino Ruiz, et al.
04/29/2014Fully hyperlinked brief filed Hyperlinked version of the Petition for Review that was filed on April 16, 2014. On behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
04/16/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
03/13/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due April 16, 2014.
03/13/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of TV Azteca, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/15/2016Case StoredCase stored.e-stored COA Record: G02 Row 7 A-1 (2 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ruiz, Gloria De Los Angeles TrevinoRespondentMr. Raymond L. Thomas Jr.
Mr. Ricardo Pumarejo Jr.
Mr. David H. Jones
Ms. Rebecca Vela
Chapoy, PatriciaPetitionerMs. Holly May Dobbs Arnold
Mr. Kurt Schwarz
Mr. Christopher C. Franz
Mr. Thomas J. Forestier
Mr. Gil P. Peralez
Mr. David F. Johnson
Mr. Merritt M. Clements
Mr. Paul C. Watler
Publimax, S.A. de C.V.PetitionerMr. Kurt Schwarz
Mr. Paul C. Watler
Mr. Jorge A. Padilla  
Mr. Gil P. Peralez
Mr. Christopher C. Franz
Woolley, Patrick Amicus CuriaeMr. Patrick Woolley
TV Azeteca, S.A.B. de C.V.PetitionerMr. Gil P. Peralez
Mr. Christopher C. Franz
Mr. Merritt M. Clements
Mr. Thomas J. Forestier
Ms. Holly May Dobbs Arnold
Mr. Kurt Schwarz
Mr. Paul C. Watler
Mr. David F. Johnson
Texas Association of BroadcastersAmicus CuriaeMr. Thomas S. Leatherbury
Albright, Alexandra WilsonAmicus CuriaeMs. Alexandra W. Albright
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
494 SW3d 109, 01-30-14 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rogelio Valdez 
Trial Court Information
139th District Court 
Hidalgo 
Honorable Jose Roberto Flores 
C-1027-09-C 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site