Supreme Court

Case: 14-0148    
14-0148
02/24/2014
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
DANNY DALE WEISINGER, SR. 
STATE OF TEXAS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/18/2014Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger. (1)
03/31/2014Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger, Sr.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/31/2014Case Stored e-stored
07/31/2014Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
07/25/2014Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
06/24/2014Case forwarded to Court  
06/18/2014Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger. (1)
06/06/2014Petition for Review disposedDenied 
05/06/2014Case forwarded to Court  
03/31/2014Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger, Sr.
03/26/2014Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger, Sr.
03/10/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition due 04/09/14.
03/10/2014Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Affidavit of Inability to Pay filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger, Sr.
02/26/2014Notice requesting filing fee Fee request sent to petitioner for $10.
02/24/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed on behalf of Danny Dale Weisinger.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/31/2014Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Weisinger, Senior, Danny DalePetitionerMr. Danny Dale Weisinger Senior
State of TexasRespondentMs. Donna Kaspar  
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismissed 
___ SW3d ___, 07-31-13 
12th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sam Griffith 
Trial Court Information
349th District Court 
Houston 
Honorable Pamela Foster Fletcher 
03CR-035 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site