Supreme Court

Case: 14-0145    
14-0145
02/24/2014
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE GHX INDUSTRIAL, LLC 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/26/2014Reply BriefRelatorRelator's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
08/08/2014Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of MEMC Pasadena, Inc.
07/21/2014Brief on the MeritsRelatorRelator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
05/09/2014Reply to ResponseRelatorReply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
04/29/2014Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petiiton for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of MEMC Pasadena, Inc.
02/24/2014Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/21/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedDenied 
08/26/2014Reply Brief Relator's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
08/08/2014Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of MEMC Pasadena, Inc.
07/21/2014Brief on the Merits Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
07/07/2014Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted.  Relator's Brief is due July 21, 2014.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.  Response Brief is due August 11, 2014.  Reply Brief is due August 26, 2014.
07/03/2014Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
06/06/2014Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Relator's brief on the merits due no later than 7/7/14; Response brief due 7/28/14; Reply brief due 8/12/14.
06/06/2014Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing dismissed as mootReal Party in Interest's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply dismissed as moot.
05/28/2014Reply to Response to Motion Real Party in Interest MEMC Pasadena Inc's Reply in support of its Motion for Leave to file Sur-Reply.
05/23/2014Response to Motion filed Response to Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
05/22/2014Motion for leave to file brief Opposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed on behalf of MEMC Pasadena, Inc.
05/12/2014Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Ms. DeVaughn.  She will let us know if she has any issue resubmitting the Reply Brief so that it is combined as one document.
05/09/2014Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
05/06/2014Call received Attorney for relator called to inform the Court that they will be efiling a reply to rlp's response to pet/writ of mandamus by the end of the week.
04/29/2014Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petiiton for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of MEMC Pasadena, Inc.
04/04/2014Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 5/5/14.
03/04/2014Case forwarded to Court  
02/25/2014Case Record Filed  Mandamus Record (e-file is incorporated with Petition) filed on behalf of GHX Industrial LLC.
02/24/2014Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of GHX Industrial, LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/21/2015Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MEMC Pasadena, Inc.Real Party in Interest Mr. Richard E. Griffin
Mr. Kurt Schwarz
Ms. Crystal J. Parker
Mr. Jason Gregory Johns  
GHX Industrial, LLCRelatorMr. Steven J. Knight
The Honorable Kevin D. Jewell
Ms. Melissa Dorman Matthews
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 01-23-14 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
295th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Caroline E. Baker 
2008-48034 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site